EP0783335 - AN ADAPTOR FOR MEDICINE BOTTLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.06.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stat Medical Devices Inc. 1835 N.E. 146th Street North Miami, FL 33181 / US | [1997/45] |
Former [1997/29] | For all designated states Schraga, Steven 9433 Byron Avenue Surfside, FL 33154 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schraga, Steven 9433 Byron Avenue Surfside, FL 33154 / US | [2001/25] |
Former [1997/29] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/29] | Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing. WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94919360.1 | 06.06.1994 | [1997/29] | WO1994US06304 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9533505 | Date: | 14.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0783335 | Date: | 16.07.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.12.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/32 | [1997/29] | CPC: |
A61J1/2096 (EP,US);
A61J1/201 (EP,US);
A61J1/2065 (EP,US);
A61M2205/583 (EP,US);
A61M2205/585 (EP,US);
Y10S215/03 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1997/29] | Title | German: | EIN ADAPTER FÜR EINE MEDIKAMENTENFLASCHE | [1997/29] | English: | AN ADAPTOR FOR MEDICINE BOTTLE | [1997/29] | French: | ADAPTATEUR POUR FLACONS DE MEDICAMENTS | [1997/29] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.1997 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.1997 | Search fee paid | 07.01.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 07.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/29] | 22.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/31] | 20.02.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2002/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4944736 (HOLTZ LEONARD J [US]) [Y] 1-3,5,6 * column W *; | [Y]GB2052992 (BEARD R K, et al) [Y] 1-3,5,6 * column A; figure - *; | [Y]WO9100215 (UNIV FLORIDA [US]) [Y] 2 * page 11, line 1 - line 17; figure 1 *; | [Y]US5247972 (TETREAULT EMERY J [US]) [Y] 5,6 * column 3, line 7 - line 14; figure 3 *; | [A]US4969883 (GILBERT MICHAEL D [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure 4 * | International search | [X]US5088996 (KOPFER RUDOLPH J [US], et al); | [X]US5171214 (KOLBER CHRIS M [US], et al); | [A]US5202093 (CLOYD WILLLIAM C [US]); | [A]US5297599 (BUCHELI RUDOLF [CH]) |