EP0803162 - SYNCHRONIZING A PACKETIZED DIGITAL DATASTREAM TO AN OUTPUT PROCESSOR IN A TELEVISION SIGNAL PROCESSING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2005 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RCA Thomson Licensing Corporation 2 Independence Way Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | [1997/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ACAMPORA, Alfonse, Anthony 56 Dawson Circle Staten Island, NY 10314 / US | 02 /
BUNTING, Richard, Michael Apartment 10 1015 Hughes Drive Hamilton Square, NJ 08609 / US | 03 /
LYONS, Paul, Wallace 9 Kenyon Drive New Egypt, NJ 08533 / US | [1997/44] | Representative(s) | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte, et al Technicolor European Patent Operations 1-5 Rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte, et al Thomson multimedia Patent Department 46 Quai A. le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1997/44] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte, et al THOMSON multimedia, 46 quai A. Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 94919502.8 | 15.06.1994 | [1997/44] | WO1994US06803 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9534990 | Date: | 21.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/54] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0803162 | Date: | 29.10.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.12.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/24, H04N7/62 | [2000/37] | CPC: |
H04N21/242 (EP);
H04N7/56 (EP,KR);
H04L25/05 (EP);
H04N19/00 (EP);
H04N19/61 (EP);
H04N21/236 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1997/44] | H04N7/01 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/44] | Title | German: | SYNCHRONISATION EINES DIGITALEN DATENSTROMPACKETS ZU EINEM AUSGANGSPROZESSOR IN EINEM FERNSEHSIGNALVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM | [1997/44] | English: | SYNCHRONIZING A PACKETIZED DIGITAL DATASTREAM TO AN OUTPUT PROCESSOR IN A TELEVISION SIGNAL PROCESSING SYSTEM | [1997/44] | French: | SYNCHRONISATION D'UN FLUX DE DONNEES NUMERIQUES EN PAQUETS ALIMENTANT UN PROCESSEUR DE SORTIE DANS UN SYSTEME DE TRAITEMENT DE SIGNAUX DE TELEVISION | [1997/44] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.1996 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.1996 | Search fee paid | 11.12.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/44] | 21.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/22] | 05.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1997 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   13.08.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO9601024 (THOMSON MULTIMEDIA SA [FR], et al) [E] 1-5,7,8,11,16 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5287178 (ACAMPORA ALFONSE A [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,5,7,8,16 * the whole document *; | [Y]US4583238 (BOISSEAU ALAIN [FR], et al) [Y] 1,2,5,7,8,16 * column 6, line 45 - line 50 * * column 11, line 63 - column 12, line 25; figure 1 *; | [A]JPH0463035 ; | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920618), vol. 016, no. 271, Database accession no. (E - 1218), & JP04063035 A 19920228 (SHARP CORP) [A] 1-16 * abstract * | [A] - NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF BROADCASTERS (NAB), "TRANSPORT SYSTEM", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL BROADCAST ENGINEERING CONFERENCE,US,----, NAB, (1994), vol. CONF. 48, pages 1 - 17,27-36, XP000674109 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US5287178 (ACAMPORA ALFONSE A [US], et al); | [A]US5231486 (ACAMPORA ALFONSE A [US], et al) |