EP0708740 - PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR BIOLOGICAL TREATMENT OF WATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2000 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORDIC WATER PRODUCTS AKTIEBOLAG Box 1004 14925 Nynäshamn / SE | [1999/48] |
Former [1996/18] | For all designated states NORDIC WATER PRODUCTS AKTIEBOLAG Box 1004 S-14925 Nynäshamn / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JÖNSSON, Kurt Björkstigen 8 S-149 50 Nynäshamn / SE | 02 /
LENVIK, Lennart Estövägen 4D S-149 50 Nynäshamn / SE | 03 /
HAGROT, Magnus Skivlingsvägen 20 S-132 42 Saltsjö-Boo / SE | 04 /
OSKARSSON, Jonas Estövägen 4C S-149 50 Nynäshamn / SE | [1996/18] | Representative(s) | Billberg, Hans Ehrner & Delmar Patentbyra AB Box 10 316 100 55 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/18] | Billberg, Hans Axel Ehrners Patentbyra AB Box 10 316 S-100 55 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 94919920.2 | 08.06.1994 | [1996/18] | WO1994SE00555 | Priority number, date | SE19930002184 | 23.06.1993 Original published format: SE 9302184 | [1996/18] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9500447 | Date: | 05.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0708740 | Date: | 01.05.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0708740 | Date: | 01.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 05.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C02F3/00, C02F3/08 | [1996/18] | CPC: |
C02F3/1226 (EP,US);
C02F3/223 (EP,US);
Y02W10/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1996/18] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BIOLOGISCHEN BEHANDLUNG VON WASSER | [1996/18] | English: | PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR BIOLOGICAL TREATMENT OF WATER | [1996/18] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT BIOLOGIQUE DE L'EAU | [1996/18] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.1995 | Translation filed | 20.12.1995 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 21.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/18] | 24.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.12.1999 | BE | 01.12.1999 | ES | 01.12.1999 | FR | 01.12.1999 | IT | 01.12.1999 | [2008/05] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 01.12.1999 | |
BE | 01.12.1999 | ||
ES | 01.12.1999 | ||
FR | 01.12.1999 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 01.12.1999 | |
BE | 01.12.1999 | ||
ES | 01.12.1999 | ||
FR | 28.04.2000 | ||
Former [2001/09] | AT | 01.12.1999 | |
BE | 01.12.1999 | ||
FR | 28.04.2000 | ||
Former [2000/51] | AT | 01.12.1999 | |
BE | 01.12.1999 | ||
Former [2000/43] | BE | 01.12.1999 | Cited in | International search | [A]JP60166093 ; | [A]US4231863 (SUTPHIN ELDON M); | [YX]CH667080 (SANKI ENG CO LTD) | [Y] - TIBTECH, Volume 11, April 1993, MARK C.M. VAN LOOSDRECHT et al.: "Biofilm bioreactors for wastewater treatment", page 117 - page 121, see page 119, column 1, line 14 - line 17, page 120, column 1, line 17 - line 23. | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACT OF JAPAN, Vol. 10, No. 4, C-322; & JP,A,60 166 093 (EBARA INFILCO K.K.), 29 August 1985., & JP60166093 A 19850829 |