EP0705365 - DEFIBERED FLUFF PULP AND METHOD FOR ITS PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/15] | DEFIBERED CELLULOSE PRODUCT AND METHOD FOR ITS PREPARATION | ||
[1998/34] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 27.02.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STORA KOPPARBERGS BERGSLAGS AKTIEBOLAG Asgatan 22 S-791 80 Falun / SE | [1996/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NORLANDER, Leif Länsmansvägen 7 S-791 61 Falun / SE | [1996/15] | Representative(s) | Johansson, Lars E., et al Hynell Patenttjänst AB Patron Carls väg 2 683 40 Hagfors/Uddeholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/51] | Johansson, Lars E., et al Hynell Patenttjänst AB Patron Carls Väg 2 683 40 Hagfors/Uddeholm / SE | ||
Former [1996/15] | Hynell, Magnus Hynell Patenttjänst AB, Box 2236 S-683 02 Hagfors / SE | Application number, filing date | 94919951.7 | 21.06.1994 | [1996/15] | WO1994SE00613 | Priority number, date | SE19930002166 | 23.06.1993 Original published format: SE 9302166 | [1996/15] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9500703 | Date: | 05.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0705365 | Date: | 10.04.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0705365 | Date: | 19.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 05.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | D21H11/20, D21H17/06, A61L15/16 | [1996/15] | CPC: |
D04H1/425 (EP,US);
A61L15/28 (EP,US);
D06M13/123 (EP,US);
D06M13/148 (EP,US);
D06M13/192 (EP,US);
D06M13/35 (EP,US);
D06M13/432 (EP,US);
D21H11/20 (EP,US);
D21H17/06 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61L15/28, C08L1/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [1996/15] | Title | German: | ZERFASERTE FLAUMPULPE, UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [1998/34] | English: | DEFIBERED FLUFF PULP AND METHOD FOR ITS PREPARATION | [1998/34] | French: | PATE DUVET DEFIBREE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ASSOCIE | [1998/34] |
Former [1996/15] | ZERFASERTES ZELLSTOFFPRODUKT, UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | ||
Former [1996/15] | DEFIBERED CELLULOSE PRODUCT AND METHOD FOR ITS PREPARATION | ||
Former [1996/15] | PRODUIT A BASE DE CELLULOSE DEFIBREE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ASSOCIE | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.1994 | Translation filed | 20.11.1995 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.12.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 21.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/15] | 12.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
18.05.1999
21.06.1999
ADMISSIBLE Procter & Gamble GmbH Patent Department Postfach 25 03 D-65818 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE Opponent's representative Boulinguiez, Didier Cabinet Plasseraud ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.05.1999
21.06.1999
ADMISSIBLE Procter & Gamble GmbH Patent Department Postfach 25 03 D-65818 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE Opponent's representative Boulinguiez, Didier Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2003/43] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.05.1999
21.06.1999
ADMISSIBLE Procter & Gamble GmbH Patent Department Postfach 25 03 D-65818 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE Opponent's representative Boulinguiez, Didier Cabinet Plasseraud 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1999/27] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.05.1999
Procter & Gamble GmbH Patent Department Postfach 25 03 D-65818 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE Opponent's representative Boulinguiez, Didier Cabinet Plasseraud 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75009 Paris / FR | 24.06.1999 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 25.10.1999 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 05.03.2001 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.04.2001 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 11.04.2001 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 14.01.2004 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2004/16] | Appeal following opposition | 18.06.2001 | Appeal received No. T0672/01 | 17.08.2001 | Statement of grounds filed | 14.01.2004 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 14.01.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.02.2004 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4888093 (DEAN WALTER L [US], et al); | [A]WO8804704 (WEYERHAEUSER CO [US]) |