EP0724443 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR LOWERING INTRAOCULAR PRESSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.2002 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.07.2002 [2002/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VIDE PHARMACEUTICALS 1832 Edgecliff Drive Los Angeles, CA 90024 / US | [1996/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SORGENTE, Nino 1832 Edgecliff Drive Los Angeles, CA 90024 / US | 02 /
BAKHIT, Charles 4722 Rodeo Lane La Verne, CA 91750 / US | [1996/32] | Representative(s) | Greaves, Carol Pauline, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/32] | Greaves, Carol Pauline, et al Mewburn Ellis York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 94920077.8 | 03.06.1994 | [1996/32] | WO1994US06278 | Priority number, date | US19930073802 | 08.06.1993 Original published format: US 73802 | US19930096799 | 23.07.1993 Original published format: US 96799 | [1996/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9428900 | Date: | 22.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0724443 | Date: | 07.08.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.12.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/445, A61K31/49, A61K31/64 | [1997/34] | CPC: |
A61K31/121 (EP);
A61K31/20 (EP);
A61K31/49 (EP);
A61K31/5415 (EP);
A61K31/64 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1996/32] | A61K31/445 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/32] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND PRÄPARATE ZUR SENKUNG DES AUGENINNENDRUCKS | [1996/32] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR LOWERING INTRAOCULAR PRESSURE | [1996/32] | French: | PROCEDES ET COMOSITIONS D'ABAISSEMENT DE LA PRESSION INTRA-OCULAIRE | [1996/32] | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.1995 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.1995 | Search fee paid | 29.12.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/32] | 09.01.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/28] | 08.02.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/28] | 15.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1998 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   20.10.1998 | 30.06.1999 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   29.07.1999 | 30.06.2000 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   21.12.2000 | 30.06.2001 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0467710 (SQUIBB & SONS INC [US]) [X] 1-9 * page 2, line 51 - page 4, line 6 * * claims 1-21 *; | [X]GB2177913 (SANOFI SA) [X] 1-4,6-8 * page 3, line 11 - line 21 * * page 4, line 6 - line 9 * * example 2 * * claims 1-9 *; | [X]EP0171331 (VAILLANT DEFRESNE LAB [FR]) [X] 1-4,6-8 * examples 1-3 * * claims 1,2 *; | [X]EP0467709 (SQUIBB & SONS INC [US]) [X] 1-9 * page 2, line 55 - page 4, line 4 * * claims 1-17 *; | [PX]WO9402142 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [PX] 1,3,5,7,8 * page 9, line 19 - page 10, line 8 * * page 14, line 25 - page 15, line 12 * * page 33, line 10 - line 29 * * page 37, line 18 - line 26 * * page 52, line 19 - line 29 * * claims 4,9,10 * | International search | [Y]US4895807 (CHERKSEY BRUCE D [US]) |