EP0705269 - TITANIUM(II) OR ZIRCONIUM(II) COMPLEXES AND ADDITION POLYMERIZATION CATALYSTS THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.1997 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.1998 [1998/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | [1997/48] |
Former [1996/15] | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center, Abbott Road Midland, Michigan 48640 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEVORE, David, D. 4881 East Shaffer Road Midland, MI 48642 / US | 02 /
CRAWFORD, Lenore, H. 2023 Asham Street Midland, MI 48640 / US | 03 /
STEVENS, James, C. 2026 Pecan Trail Drive Richmond, TX 77469 / US | 04 /
TIMMERS, Francis, J. 4606 Lund Drive Midland, MI 48642 / US | 05 /
MUSSELL, Robert, D. 3800 Haskin Drive Midland, MI 48640 / US | 06 /
WILSON, David, R. 1220 West Stewart Road Midland, MI 48640 / US | 07 /
ROSEN, Robert, K. 5414 Avondale Drive Sugar Land, TX 77479 / US | [1996/23] |
Former [1996/15] | 01 /
DEVORE, David, D. 4881 East Shaffer Road Midland, MI 48642 / US | ||
02 /
CRAWFORD, Lenore, H. 507 West Chapel Lane Midland, MI 48640 / US | |||
03 /
STEVENS, James, C. 2026 Pecan Trail Drive Richmond, TX 77469 / US | |||
04 /
TIMMERS, Francis, J. 4606 Lund Drive Midland, MI 48642 / US | |||
05 /
MUSSELL, Robert, D. 3800 Haskin Drive Midland, MI 48640 / US | |||
06 /
WILSON, David, R. 1220 West Stewart Road Midland, MI 48640 / US | |||
07 /
ROSEN, Robert, K. 5414 Avondale Drive Sugar Land, TX 77479 / US | Representative(s) | Burford, Anthony Frederick Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/15] | Burford, Anthony Frederick W.H. Beck, Greener & Co. 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 94920244.4 | 16.06.1994 | [1996/15] | WO1994US06834 | Priority number, date | US19930082197 | 24.06.1993 Original published format: US 82197 | US19940230051 | 19.04.1994 Original published format: US 230051 | US19940241523 | 12.05.1994 Original published format: US 241523 | [1996/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9500526 | Date: | 05.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0705269 | Date: | 10.04.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0705269 | Date: | 15.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C07F17/00, C08F10/00, C08F4/649 | [1996/15] | CPC: |
C07F17/00 (EP,US);
C08F10/00 (EP,US);
C08F210/02 (EP,US);
C08F210/16 (EP,US);
C08F210/18 (EP,US);
C08F4/65904 (EP,US);
C08F4/65908 (EP,US);
C08F4/65912 (EP,US);
C08F4/65916 (EP,US);
C08F4/6592 (EP,US);
Y10S526/901 (EP,US);
Y10S526/905 (EP,US);
Y10S526/943 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/6592 (EP,US);
C08F210/02, C08F212/08, C08F2500/12 (US,EP);
C08F210/16, C08F210/06, C08F2500/17 (US,EP);
C08F210/16, C08F210/14, C08F2500/12 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1996/15] | Title | German: | TITAN-UND ZIRKONIUMKOMPLEXE UND DIESE ENTHALTENDE POLYMERISATIONSKATALYSATOREN | [1996/15] | English: | TITANIUM(II) OR ZIRCONIUM(II) COMPLEXES AND ADDITION POLYMERIZATION CATALYSTS THEREFROM | [1996/15] | French: | COMPLEXES DE TITANE (II) OU DE ZIRCONIUM (II) ET CATALYSEURS DE POLYMERISATION PAR ADDITION OBTENUS A PARTIR DE CES COMPLEXES | [1996/15] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.1996 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/16] | 18.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0277004 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [A] 1-33; | [DA]EP0416815 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [DA] 1-33 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0495375 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [A] 1-33 * the whole document *; | [DA]US5198401 (TURNER HOWARD W [US], et al) [DA] 1-33* column W * |