EP0706462 - DRIVE ARRANGEMENT FOR A HYBRID VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.10.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fichtel & Sachs AG Ernst-Sachs-Strasse 62 D-97424 Schweinfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/16] | For all designated states FICHTEL & SACHS AG Ernst-Sachs-Strasse 62 D-97424 Schweinfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUTZ, Dieter Spessartstrasse 12 D-97422 Schweinfurt / DE | 02 /
BAUCH-PANETZKY, Dieter An der Eselshöhe 93 D-97422 Schweinfurt / DE | 03 /
THIELER, Wolfgang Kastanienweg 1 D-97437 Hassfurt / DE | [1996/16] | Representative(s) | Meissner, Peter E., et al Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Hohenzollerndamm 89 14199 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/16] | Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing., et al Meissner & Meissner, Patentanwaltsbüro, Hohenzollerndamm 89 D-14199 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 94920380.6 | 28.06.1994 | [1996/16] | WO1994DE00774 | Priority number, date | DE19934323601 | 09.07.1993 Original published format: DE 4323601 | [1996/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9501884 | Date: | 19.01.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0706462 | Date: | 17.04.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0706462 | Date: | 27.12.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B60K6/04 | [1996/16] | CPC: |
B60K6/26 (EP,US);
B60K6/387 (EP,US);
B60K6/40 (EP,US);
B60K6/48 (EP,US);
B60L15/20 (EP,US);
B60L15/2009 (EP,US);
B60L50/15 (EP,US);
B60L50/16 (EP,US);
F02N11/04 (EP,US);
F16D13/50 (EP,US);
H02K1/2791 (EP,US);
H02K21/22 (EP,US);
H02K7/006 (EP,US);
H02K7/108 (EP,US);
B60K2006/264 (EP,US);
B60K2006/268 (EP);
B60L2240/12 (EP,US);
B60L2240/421 (EP,US);
B60L2240/441 (EP,US);
B60L2250/24 (EP,US);
B60L2250/26 (EP,US);
B60L2260/26 (EP,US);
B60W2540/106 (EP,US);
H02K1/28 (EP,US);
H02K29/06 (EP,US);
Y02T10/62 (EP,US);
Y02T10/64 (EP,US);
Y02T10/7072 (EP,US);
Y02T10/72 (EP,US);
Y10S903/903 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1996/33] |
Former [1996/16] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT | Title | German: | ANTRIEBSANORDNUNG FÜR EIN HYBRIDFAHRZEUG | [1996/16] | English: | DRIVE ARRANGEMENT FOR A HYBRID VEHICLE | [1996/16] | French: | SYSTEME D'ENTRAINEMENT POUR VEHICULE HYBRIDE | [1996/16] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.1995 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/16] | 29.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 27.12.1996 | GB | 27.12.1996 | IT | 27.12.1996 | [2002/26] |
Former [1999/42] | GB | 27.12.1996 | |
IT | 27.12.1996 | ||
Former [1997/42] | GB | 27.12.1996 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB993185 (PAPST HERMANN); | [A]DE3230121 (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG [DE]); | [A]DE3243514 (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG [DE], et al); | [X]EP0528412 (AISIN AW CO [JP]) | Examination | WO9108919 |