EP0703851 - ABRASIVE BELTS WITH AN ENDLESS, FLEXIBLE, SEAMLESS BACKING AND METHODS OF PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/14] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHNEIDER, Michael, J. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
KRISHNAN, Subramanian P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [1996/14] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/14] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94920694.0 | 31.05.1994 | [1996/14] | WO1994US06095 | Priority number, date | US19930079364 | 17.06.1993 Original published format: US 79364 | US19940242295 | 13.05.1994 Original published format: US 242295 | [1996/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9500294 | Date: | 05.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0703851 | Date: | 03.04.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0703851 | Date: | 24.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B24D11/00, B24D18/00, B29C41/04, B29C41/20 | [1996/14] | CPC: |
B29C41/20 (EP);
B24D11/00 (EP,KR);
B24D11/02 (EP);
B24D18/00 (EP,KR);
B24D3/28 (EP);
B29C41/04 (KR);
B29C41/042 (EP);
B29C53/58 (EP);
B29K2105/0002 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1996/14] | Title | German: | SCHLEIFBAND MIT EINEM ENDLOSEN, BIEGSAMEN, NAHTLOSEN TRÄGER UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [1996/14] | English: | ABRASIVE BELTS WITH AN ENDLESS, FLEXIBLE, SEAMLESS BACKING AND METHODS OF PREPARATION | [1996/14] | French: | BANDES ABRASIVES A SUPPORT SANS SOUDURE, SOUPLE, SANS FIN ET LEURS PROCEDES DE PREPARATION | [1996/14] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.1996 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/14] | 03.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 20.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 27.08.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 24.03.1999 | [2002/26] | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP0095055 (SEA SCHLEIFM ENTW ANWEND [DE]) [X] 1,20,23,32,33 * page 7 - page 13; figures 7,8 * [A] 24,25; | [X]EP0533482 (XEROX CORP [US]) [X] 1 * page 5, column 14 - column 46; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US4373933 (GRAZEN ALFRED E [US]) [X] 20 * column A *; | [DA]US4018574 (DYER HUGH N) [DA] 1,20,23-25,32,33 * column W *; | [A]US4394340 (TARUMI NORIYOSHI [JP], et al); | [A]EP0349466 (COTERON URIARTE JOSE RAMON) |