EP0765542 - PROCESS FOR CONTROLLING A RELUCTANCE ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/14] | PROCESS FOR CONTROLLING THE SWITCHING-OFF PROCESS OF THE BRANCHES OF A RELUCTANCE ENGINE | ||
[1998/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.1999 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.07.1999 [1999/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | [1999/14] |
Former [1997/14] | For all designated states Daimler-Benz Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 80 02 30 70546 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ORTHMANN, Reinhard Auf der Burg 22 D-55130 Mainz / DE | [1997/14] | Representative(s) | Fröhling, Werner Otto, et al DaimlerChrysler AG Intellectual Property Management Sedanstrasse 10-Geb. 17 89077 Ulm / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/22] | Fröhling, Werner Otto, Dr., et al Daimler-Benz AG, Intellectual Property Management, Sedanstr. 10/Gebäude 17 89077 Ulm / DE | ||
Former [1997/14] | Erbacher, Alfons, Dipl.-Ing. AEG Aktiengesellschaft 60591 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 94920927.4 | 13.06.1994 | [1997/14] | WO1994EP01916 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9534947 | Date: | 21.12.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/54] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0765542 | Date: | 02.04.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0765542 | Date: | 29.07.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H02P7/05 | [1997/14] | CPC: |
H02P25/0925 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1997/14] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES RELUKTANZMOTORS | [1998/31] | English: | PROCESS FOR CONTROLLING A RELUCTANCE ENGINE | [1998/31] | French: | PROCEDE DE COMMANDE D'UN MOTEUR A RELUCTANCE | [1998/31] |
Former [1997/14] | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DES ABSCHALTVORGANGS IN DEN STRÄNGEN EINES RELUKTANZMOTORS | ||
Former [1997/14] | PROCESS FOR CONTROLLING THE SWITCHING-OFF PROCESS OF THE BRANCHES OF A RELUCTANCE ENGINE | ||
Former [1997/14] | PROCEDE DE COMMANDE DU PROCESSUS DE DECONNEXION DES BRANCHES D'UN MOTEUR A RELUCTANCE | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.1996 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/14] | 06.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]US4739240 (MACMINN STEPHEN R [US], et al) [DA] 1* column W *; | [A]FR2697697 (VALEO SYSTEMES DESSUYAGE [FR]) [A] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0599334 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1,3 * abstract * | [A] - P.J. LAWRENSON ET AL, "Variable-speed switched reluctance motors", IEE PROC., (198007), vol. 127B, no. 4, pages 253 - 265 [A] 1 * page 260; figure 11 * |