EP0711260 - USE OF BASIC ALUMINIUM SULPHATES AS ALKALI-POOR CEMENT ACCELERATING ADMIXTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 13.03.2002 [2002/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Giulini Chemie GmbH Giulinistrasse 2 Postfach 150 480 D-67029 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/20] | For all designated states Giulini Chemie GmbH Giulinistrasse 2 Postfach 150 480 D-67029 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HELMBOLDT, Otto Jenaer Weg 17 D-67071 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
POTENCSIK, Istvan Am Steingarten 6 D-68169 Mannheim / DE | 03 /
BREKER, Johannes Eichenstrasse 23 D-67067 Ludwigshafen / DE | 04 /
SEDELIES, Reinhold Bayernstrasse 8 D-67105 Schifferstadt / DE | 05 /
ROGGENKAMP, Detlev Semmelweisstrasse 10 D-67071 Ludwigshafen / DE | [1996/20] | Application number, filing date | 94920969.6 | 05.07.1994 | [1996/20] | WO1994EP02190 | Priority number, date | DE19934324959 | 24.07.1993 Original published format: DE 4324959 | [1996/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9503257 | Date: | 02.02.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0711260 | Date: | 15.05.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0711260 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C04B22/14 | [1996/20] | CPC: |
C04B22/148 (EP,US);
C04B2103/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/20] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON BASISCHEN ALUMINIUMSULFATEN ALS ALKALIARME ABBINDEBESCHLEUNIGER FÜR ZEMENT | [1996/20] | English: | USE OF BASIC ALUMINIUM SULPHATES AS ALKALI-POOR CEMENT ACCELERATING ADMIXTURES | [1996/20] | French: | UTILISATION DE SULFATES BASIQUES D'ALUMINIUM COMME ACCELERATEURS DE PRISE PEU ALCALINS POUR CIMENT | [1996/20] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.1996 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/20] | 12.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 12.03.1997 | GR | 12.03.1997 | IE | 12.03.1997 | SE | 12.06.1997 | [2000/05] |
Former [1999/16] | DK | 12.03.1997 | |
IE | 12.03.1997 | ||
SE | 12.06.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | DK | 12.03.1997 | |
SE | 12.06.1997 | ||
Former [1998/11] | SE | 12.06.1997 | Cited in | International search | JPS78146297 [ ] (NIPPON LIGHT METAL CO., LTD.); | CS257142 [ ] (S. SLANICKA ET AL); | [YA]DE2018129 (W.R. GRACE & CO) [Y] 4,7 * page 3, line 8 - line 21 * * page 5, line 32 - page 7, line 38; example 1; claims 1-3,5-9 * [A] 1,3,5; | [Y]EP0110847 (BOLIDEN AB [SE]) [Y] 3-5 * abstract * * page 4, line 35 - page 6, line 10 * * page 8, line 13 - line 33 *; | [XY]EP0321445 (TERRANOVA IND GMBH [AT]) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 2, line 40 - line 62; example 2 * [Y] 2-5,7 | [Y] - Y. FJIHIRA ET AL, "Transparent aqueous aluminium sulphate from alumina sludge", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19790625), vol. 90, no. 26, Database accession no. 206693v, page 162 [Y] 2 * abstract * | [DX] - S. SLANICKA, "Rapid-setting cement mixtures", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19890918), vol. 111, no. 6, Database accession no. 102002e, page 302 [DX] 1 * abstract * | Examination | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 90, no. 26, 25. Juni 1979, Columbus, OhioUS; | - abstract no. 206693vY. FJIHIRA ET AL 'Transparent aqueous aluminium sulphate from alumina sludge' Seite 162 ; |