EP0707692 - DEVICE FOR PROVIDING A SEAL BETWEEN TWO PARTS OF AN INSTALLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.10.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MANNESMANN Aktiengesellschaft Mannesmannufer 2 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/17] | For all designated states MANNESMANN Aktiengesellschaft Mannesmannufer 2 D-40213 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JANICH, Hans-Jürgen Regelkamp 12 D-59269 Beckum / DE | [1996/17] | Representative(s) | Tetzner, Volkmar Anwaltskanzlei Dr. Tetzner Van-Gogh-Strasse 3 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/17] | Tetzner, Volkmar, Dr.-Ing. Dr. jur. Van-Gogh-Strasse 3 D-81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94920975.3 | 07.07.1994 | [1996/17] | WO1994EP02221 | Priority number, date | DE19934322806 | 08.07.1993 Original published format: DE 4322806 | [1996/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9502136 | Date: | 19.01.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0707692 | Date: | 24.04.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0707692 | Date: | 27.12.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/08, F16K1/226 | [1996/17] | CPC: |
F16K1/2266 (EP,US);
F16J15/0893 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/17] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ABDICHTUNG ZWISCHEN ZWEI ANLAGENTEILEN | [1996/17] | English: | DEVICE FOR PROVIDING A SEAL BETWEEN TWO PARTS OF AN INSTALLATION | [1996/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT D'ASSURER L'ETANCHEITE ENTRE DEUX PARTIES D'UNE INSTALLATION | [1996/17] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.1995 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.06.1995 | Examination requested [1996/17] | 11.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 27.12.1996 | FR | 27.12.1996 | GB | 27.12.1996 | NL | 27.12.1996 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/08] | DK | 27.12.1996 | |
GB | 27.12.1996 | ||
NL | 27.12.1996 | ||
FR | 23.05.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | DK | 27.12.1996 | |
GB | 27.12.1996 | ||
FR | 23.05.1997 | ||
Former [1997/44] | GB | 27.12.1996 | |
FR | 23.05.1997 | ||
Former [1997/42] | GB | 27.12.1996 | Cited in | International search | [YA]DE501524 (HARTMANN A G MASCHF) [Y] 1 * figure .; claim . * [A] 2; | [YD]EP0340430 (PKS ENGINEERING [DE]) [YD] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE4122605 (ZUR STEEGE GEB HINZE ELLEN [DE]) [AD] 1,2* abstract * |