EP0660984 - PATH INTEGRITY PROVING IN OPTICAL COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.11.2003 [2003/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marconi Communications Limited New Century Park, P.O. Box 53 Coventry, CV3 1HJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | For all designated states Marconi Communications Limited New Century Park, P.O. Box 53 Coventry, CV3 1HJ / GB | ||
Former [1995/27] | For all designated states GEC-MARCONI LIMITED The Grove, Warren Lane Stanmore, Middlesex HA7 4LY / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEWART, William, James The Manor House High Street Blakesley Northamptonshire NN12 8RE / GB | [1995/27] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2003/36] |
Former [1996/18] | Branfield, Henry Anthony, et al The General Electric Company, p.l.c. GEC Patent Department Waterhouse Lane Chelmsford, Essex CM1 2QX / GB | ||
Former [1995/27] | Pope, Michael Bertram Wingate The General Electric Company, p.l.c. GEC Patent Department Waterhouse Lane Chelmsford, Essex CM1 2QX / GB | Application number, filing date | 94921024.9 | 15.07.1994 | [1995/27] | WO1994GB01530 | Priority number, date | GB19930014942 | 15.07.1993 Original published format: GB 9314942 | [1995/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9502933 | Date: | 26.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0660984 | Date: | 05.07.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0660984 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/08, G01M11/00 | [1995/27] | CPC: |
G01M11/3136 (EP);
H04B10/071 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT [1995/27] | Title | German: | STRECKENINTEGRITÄTSPRÜFUNG IN EINEM OPTISCHEN ÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEM | [2002/09] | English: | PATH INTEGRITY PROVING IN OPTICAL COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS | [1995/27] | French: | MISE EN EVIDENCE DE L'INTEGRITE DE TRAJET DANS LES SYSTEMES DE TELECOMMUNICATION OPTIQUE | [1995/27] |
Former [1995/27] | STRECKENINTEGRITATSPRUFUNG IN EINEM OPTISCHEN UBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEM | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.1995 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/27] | 20.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 02.03.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 03.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/47] | Request for further processing for: | 03.03.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 02.03.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.03.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]WO9006498 (BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS) [Y] 1,2 * abstract * * page 3, line 5 - line 8 * * page 3, line 20 - page 4, line 1 * [A] 4,8,9; | [YA]EP0486931 (ALCATEL) [Y] 1,2 * abstract * * column 1, line 7 - line 37 * [A] 8; | [A]WO9115906 (BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS) [A] 1,2,4,6 * abstract * * page 3, line 23 - line 31 * | Examination | EP0592690 |