EP0681441 - CONTAINER HAVING NO-GLUG POURING SPOUT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2006 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RING CAN CORPORATION P.O. Box 428 Oakland, TN 38060-0428 / US | [2005/47] |
Former [1995/46] | For all designated states RING CAN CORPORATION P.O. Box 428 Oakland, TN 38060-0428 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RING, Carl, D. P.O. Box 428 Oakland, TN 38060-0428 / US | [1995/46] | Representative(s) | Everitt, Christopher James Wilders fJ CLEVELAND 40/43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/46] | Everitt, Christopher James Wilders F.J. CLEVELAND & COMPANY 40/43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 94921170.0 | 11.04.1994 | [1995/46] | WO1994US03908 | Priority number, date | US19930159564 | 01.12.1993 Original published format: US 159564 | [1995/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9515104 | Date: | 08.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0681441 | Date: | 15.11.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0681441 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.06.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A47G19/14, B65D1/20, B65D23/10 | [1996/17] | CPC: |
B65D25/2826 (EP,US);
B65D1/20 (EP,US);
B65D2205/00 (EP,US);
Y10S215/902 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/46] | A47G19/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/46] | Title | German: | BEHÄLTER MIT NICHT GLUCKSENDEM AUSGUSS | [1995/46] | English: | CONTAINER HAVING NO-GLUG POURING SPOUT | [1995/46] | French: | RECIPIENT AYANT UN BEC VERSEUR EVITANT LES GLOUGLOUS | [1995/46] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.1995 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.1995 | Search fee paid | 10.03.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/46] | 25.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.1998 | Observations by third parties | 29.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.1999 | Observations by third parties | 17.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2004 | Observations by third parties | 27.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | EP05075409.2 / EP1544115 | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.11.2005 | BE | 23.11.2005 | CH | 23.11.2005 | FR | 23.11.2005 | IT | 23.11.2005 | LI | 23.11.2005 | NL | 23.11.2005 | DK | 23.02.2006 | GR | 23.02.2006 | SE | 23.02.2006 | DE | 24.02.2006 | ES | 06.03.2006 | GB | 11.04.2006 | IE | 11.04.2006 | LU | 11.04.2006 | PT | 24.04.2006 | MC | 30.04.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/36] | AT | 23.11.2005 | |
BE | 23.11.2005 | ||
CH | 23.11.2005 | ||
IT | 23.11.2005 | ||
LI | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
DE | 24.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
GB | 11.04.2006 | ||
IE | 11.04.2006 | ||
LU | 11.04.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
Former [2008/05] | AT | 23.11.2005 | |
BE | 23.11.2005 | ||
CH | 23.11.2005 | ||
IT | 23.11.2005 | ||
LI | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
DE | 24.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
GB | 11.04.2006 | ||
IE | 11.04.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/29] | AT | 23.11.2005 | |
BE | 23.11.2005 | ||
CH | 23.11.2005 | ||
LI | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
DE | 24.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
GB | 11.04.2006 | ||
IE | 11.04.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/16] | AT | 23.11.2005 | |
BE | 23.11.2005 | ||
CH | 23.11.2005 | ||
LI | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
DE | 24.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
IE | 11.04.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | AT | 23.11.2005 | |
BE | 23.11.2005 | ||
CH | 23.11.2005 | ||
LI | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
DE | 24.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/01] | AT | 23.11.2005 | |
BE | 23.11.2005 | ||
CH | 23.11.2005 | ||
LI | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
DE | 24.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | AT | 23.11.2005 | |
BE | 23.11.2005 | ||
CH | 23.11.2005 | ||
LI | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | AT | 23.11.2005 | |
BE | 23.11.2005 | ||
CH | 23.11.2005 | ||
LI | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 23.11.2005 | |
BE | 23.11.2005 | ||
CH | 23.11.2005 | ||
LI | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 23.11.2005 | |
BE | 23.11.2005 | ||
CH | 23.11.2005 | ||
LI | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 23.11.2005 | |
CH | 23.11.2005 | ||
LI | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | CH | 23.11.2005 | |
LI | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | NL | 23.11.2005 | |
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/24] | NL | 23.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US1062118 (RITTEN LOUIS N [US]); | [A]US3066819 (COX RICHARD R); | [A]US3214052 (DIKE ROY W); | [A]US4412633 (GUERRAZZI VINCENT [FR], et al); | [A]WO8602334 (MOSS GLASVAERK AS [NO]); | [A]US4804119 (GOODALL DONALD T [AU]); | [A]US4838464 (BRIGGS MILTON [US]); | [A]US5114028 (RING CARL D [US]) | Examination | GB1160983 | DE9004463U | other | GB1160983 | US4838464 | DE9004463U | EP0677445 |