EP0760910 - OVERHEATING PROTECTION DEVICE FOR ROTATIONAL CONTROL APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.2000 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.01.2001 [2001/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Horton, Inc. 1170 - 15th. Avenue Southeast Minneapolis, Minnesota 55414 / US | [1998/32] |
Former [1997/11] | For all designated states HORTON Industries, Inc. 1170 - 15th Avenue Southeast Minneapolis Minnesota 55414 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALBERG, David P.O. Box 95 Britton, SD 57430 / US | 02 /
CARLSON, Kent P.O. Box 597 Britton, SD 57430 / US | [1997/11] | Representative(s) | Pendered, Timothy George, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/11] | Pendered, Timothy George, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 94921220.3 | 01.06.1994 | [1997/11] | WO1994US06120 | Priority number, date | US19930070673 | 02.06.1993 Original published format: US 70673 | [1997/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9428326 | Date: | 08.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0760910 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0760910 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F16D9/02, F16D43/28, F16D25/063 | [1997/11] | CPC: |
F16D43/28 (EP,US);
F16D25/063 (EP,US);
F16D9/02 (EP,US);
Y10T137/1812 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7724 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1999/39] |
Former [1997/11] | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE | Title | German: | ÜBERHITZUNGSSCHUTZEINRICHTUNG FÜR DREHUNG-STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [1997/11] | English: | OVERHEATING PROTECTION DEVICE FOR ROTATIONAL CONTROL APPARATUS | [1997/11] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION CONTRE LA SURCHAUFFE POUR APPAREIL DE COMMANDE ROTATIF | [1997/11] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.1995 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.12.1995 | Examination requested [1997/11] | 05.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 15.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 26.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]AT264221B (FLUIDRIVE ENG CO LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-3,16-19 * page 2, line 41 - page 3, line 11; figures 1,2 *; | [YA]EP0179210 (ALLIED CORP [US]) [Y] 1-3,16-19 * page 2, line 21 - page 6, line 24; figure 1 * [A] 9-12; | [A]GB2242715 (VOITH GMBH J M [DE]) [A] 1* the whole document * |