Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0707775
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
04.05.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] |
02.07.1999 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 18.08.1999 [1999/33] |
10.07.1998 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 26.08.1998 [1998/35] |
26.06.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
20.05.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
24.02.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
24.02.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
21.11.1997 |
First examination report |
|
07.11.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
03.06.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
08.03.1996 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 24.04.1996 [1996/17] |
08.03.1996 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 24.04.1996 [1996/17] |
29.02.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.01.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.01.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|