EP0707581 - INDOLINE DERIVATIVES AS 5HT2C ANTAGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/17] | INDOLINE DERIVATIVES AS 5HT 2C? ANTAGONISTS | ||
[1997/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.1997 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC New Horizons Court Brentford Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/17] | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC New Horizons Court Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAM, Peter, SmithKline Beecham Pharmaceuticals Coldharbour Road, The Pinnacles Harlow, Essex CM19 5AD / GB | 02 /
JONES, Graham Elgin, SmithKline Beecham Pharm. Coldharbour Road, The Pinnacles Harlow, Essex CM19 5AD / GB | 03 /
FORBES, Ian Thomson, SmithKline Beecham Pharmac. Coldharbour Road, The Pinnacles Harlow, Essex CM19 5AD / GB | [1997/09] |
Former [1996/17] | 01 /
HAM, Peter, SmithKline Beecham Pharmaceuticals Coldharbour Road, The Pinnacles Harlow, Essex CM19 5AD / GB | ||
02 /
JONES, Graham Elgin, SmithKline Beecham Pharm. Coldharbour Road, The Pinnacles Harlow, EssexCM19 5A D / GB | |||
03 /
FORBES, Ian Thomson, SmithKline Beecham Pharmac. Coldharbour Road, The Pinnacles Harlow, EssexCM19x 5AD / GB | Representative(s) | Waters, David Martin, et al GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property (CN9.25.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/14] | Waters, David Martin, Dr., et al Smithkline Beecham plc Corporate Intellectual Property, Two New Horizons Court Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB | ||
Former [1996/17] | Summersell, Richard John, et al SmithKline Beecham Corporate Intellectual Property SB House Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | Application number, filing date | 94921638.6 | 30.06.1994 | [1996/17] | WO1994EP02148 | Priority number, date | GB19930013913 | 06.07.1993 Original published format: GB 9313913 | [1996/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9501976 | Date: | 19.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0707581 | Date: | 24.04.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0707581 | Date: | 26.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/12, A61K31/40, C07D413/12, C07D409/14 | [1996/17] | CPC: |
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
A61P1/14 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/26 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D413/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/17] | Extension states | SI | 28.12.1995 | Title | German: | INDOLIN DERIVATE ALS 5HT2C ANTAGONISTEN | [1997/09] | English: | INDOLINE DERIVATIVES AS 5HT2C ANTAGONISTS | [1997/09] | French: | DERIVES INDOLINIQUES UTILISES COMME ANTAGONISTES DE 5HT2C | [1997/09] |
Former [1996/17] | INDOLIN DERIVATE ALS 5 HT2C ANTAGONISTEN | ||
Former [1996/17] | INDOLINE DERIVATIVES AS 5HT 2C? ANTAGONISTS | ||
Former [1996/17] | DERIVES INDOLINIQUES UTILISES COMME ANTAGONISTES DE 5HT 2C? | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.1995 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/17] | 17.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.08.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.02.1997 | DK | 26.02.1997 | ES | 26.02.1997 | GR | 26.02.1997 | PT | 26.05.1997 | SE | 26.05.1997 | IE | 30.06.1997 | LU | 30.06.1997 | [2002/26] |
Former [2001/01] | AT | 26.02.1997 | |
DK | 26.02.1997 | ||
GR | 26.02.1997 | ||
PT | 26.05.1997 | ||
SE | 26.05.1997 | ||
IE | 30.06.1997 | ||
LU | 30.06.1997 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 26.02.1997 | |
DK | 26.02.1997 | ||
GR | 26.02.1997 | ||
PT | 26.05.1997 | ||
SE | 26.05.1997 | ||
LU | 30.06.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 26.02.1997 | |
DK | 26.02.1997 | ||
PT | 26.05.1997 | ||
SE | 26.05.1997 | ||
Former [1998/11] | AT | 26.02.1997 | |
PT | 26.05.1997 | ||
SE | 26.05.1997 | ||
Former [1998/03] | AT | 26.02.1997 | |
PT | 26.05.1997 | ||
Former [1997/42] | AT | 26.02.1997 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4428881 (HEDRICH LOREN W [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 1, table, first half *; | [A]WO9205170 (BEECHAM GROUP PLC [GB]) [A] 1,8 * claim - *; | [DPA]WO9404533 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC [GB], et al) [DPA] 1,8* claim - * |