EP0744109 - COMMUNICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2000 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inmarsat Ltd. 99 City Road London EC1Y 1AX / GB | [1999/38] |
Former [1996/48] | For all designated states INTERNATIONAL MOBILE SATELLITE ORGANIZATION 99 City Road London EC1Y 1AX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, Richard Douglas Lane 380 Pickersleigh Road Malvern, Worcestershire WR14 2QH / GB | 02 /
BESSET, Jean-Benoit 28, rue Castagnary F-75015 Paris / FR | [1996/48] | Representative(s) | Musker, David Charles, et al RGC Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/48] | Musker, David Charles, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 94921737.6 | 27.07.1994 | [1996/48] | WO1994GB01618 | Priority number, date | GB19940002501 | 09.02.1994 Original published format: GB 9402501 | [1996/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9522224 | Date: | 17.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0744109 | Date: | 27.11.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0744109 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/00, H04N1/327 | [1996/48] | CPC: |
H04N1/32683 (EP,US);
H04N1/00103 (EP,US);
H04N1/00281 (EP,US);
H04N1/32614 (EP,US);
H04N1/32619 (EP,US);
H04N1/32795 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1996/48] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONS VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG | [1996/48] | English: | COMMUNICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS | [1996/48] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION | [1996/48] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.1996 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/48] | 26.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 07.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/48] | Request for further processing for: | 07.10.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 07.10.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.10.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 15.12.1999 | NL | 15.12.1999 | SE | 15.12.1999 | [2008/05] |
Former [2003/08] | NL | 15.12.1999 | |
SE | 15.12.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | SE | 15.12.1999 | Cited in | International search | [YA]EP0314122 (LUMA TELECOM INC [US], et al) [Y] 8 * abstract * [A] 1,3,5,6,9; | [YA]EP0116650 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [Y] 8 * abstract * [A] 1,3,5,6,9; | [A]EP0505860 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1,5,7,9 * the whole document *; | [A] - DIMOLITSAS ET AL., "REAL-TIME TRANSMISSION OF GROUP 3 FACSIMILE OVER INTERCONNECTED PUBLIC SWITCHED DIGITAL MOBILE SATELLITE NETWORKS", COMSAT TECHNICAL REVIEW, CLARKSBURG, MD, US, (1992), vol. 22, no. 1, pages 125 - 145, XP000327959 [A] 1-9 * page 131, line 33 - page 139, line 19 * | [A] - K.C.HALTON, "THE EVOLUTION AND FUTURE OF GROUP 3 FACSIMILE STANDARDS", BT TECHNOLOGY JOURNAL, IPSWICH, SUFFOLK, GB, (199401), vol. 12, no. 1, pages 53 - 60, XP000339725 [A] 1-9 * page 58, column L, line 13 - page 58, column R, line 15 * | [A] - DIMOLITSAS ET AL., "GROUP 3 FACSIMILE TRANSMISSION OVER DIGITAL SATELLITE LAND MOBILE NETWORKS", VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY SOCIETY, 42ND VTS CONFERENCE, FRONTIERS OF TECHNOLOGY, HYATT REGENCY HOTEL, DENVER, COLORADO, (19920518), vol. 1, pages 240 - 246, XP000339725 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * |