EP0701566 - HIGH SALT BINDING BUFFER FOR IMMUNOGLOBULIN PURIFICATION WITH A SYNTHETIC AFFINITY LIGAND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.1996 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.09.1996 [1996/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UniSyn Technologies, Inc. 25 South Street Hopkinton Massachusetts 01748-2217 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/12] | For all designated states UNISYN TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 25 South Street Hopkinton, Massachusetts 01748-2217 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOFFE, Randal A. 18123 State Route 530 N.E. Arlington, WA 98223 / US | 02 /
SHI, Yuan 15485 Williams Street Apartment C-7 Tustin, CA 92680 / US | [1996/12] | Representative(s) | Hall, Marina, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/12] | Dowden, Marina, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 94921883.8 | 01.04.1994 | [1996/12] | WO1994US03615 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9526977 | Date: | 12.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0701566 | Date: | 20.03.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C07K3/12, C07K3/18, C07K3/20, C07K13/00, C07K15/00, C07K15/06, C07K15/28 | [1996/12] | CPC: |
C07K16/065 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1996/12] | Title | German: | SALZREICHER BINDUNGSPUFFER ZUR IMMUNGLOBULINREINIGUNG DURCH EINEN SYNTHETISCHEN AFFINITÄTSLIGANDEN | [1996/12] | English: | HIGH SALT BINDING BUFFER FOR IMMUNOGLOBULIN PURIFICATION WITH A SYNTHETIC AFFINITY LIGAND | [1996/12] | French: | TAMPON DE FIXATION A HAUTE TENEUR EN SEL POUR LA PURIFICATION D'IMMUNOGLOBULINES AVEC UN LIGAND D'AFFINITE SYNTHETIQUE | [1996/12] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.1995 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.1995 | Search fee paid | 21.11.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/12] | 06.07.1996 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1996/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4704366 | [XY] - Journal of Chromatography, Volume 510, issued 1990, T.T. NGO et al., "Chemistry and Preparation of Affinity Ligands Useful in Immunoglobulin Isolation and Serum Protein Separation", pages 281-291, see page 283 and page 285, lines 1-4. | [XY] - Journal of Chromatography, Volume 597, issued 1992, T.T. NGO et al., "Avid AL, A Synthetic Ligand Affinity Gel Mimicking Immobilized Bacterial Antibody Receptor for Purification of Immunoglobulin G", pages 101-109, see entire document. | [A] - Journal of Immunological Methods, Volume 52, issued 1982, M.J. ESCRIBANO et al., "Isolation of Two Immunoglobulin G Subclasses, IgG2 and IgG1, from Hamster Serum Using Protein A-Sepharose", pages 63-72, see entire document. | [A] - The Journal of Immunology, Volume 125, Number 2, issued August 1980, A.C. GILLIAM et al., "Antibodies to Double-Stranded DNA: Purification and Characterization of Binding Specificities", pages 874-885, see entire document. |