EP0706623 - SEAT FOR THE ROTATING SHAFT OF A VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.04.1999 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.06.1999 [1999/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KEYSTONE INTERNATIONAL HOLDINGS CORP. 9600 West Gulf Bank Drive Houston Texas 77040 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/16] | For all designated states KEYSTONE INTERNATIONAL HOLDINGS CORP. 9600 West Gulf Bank Drive Houston Texas 77040 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VOERMANS, Antonius, Adrianus, Maria Het Steke 8 NL-4891 WS Rijsbergen / NL | [1996/16] | Representative(s) | Ferguson, Alexander, et al Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade B.V. P.O. Box 266 2501 AW Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1996/16] | Ferguson, Alexander, et al Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade, P.O. Box 266 NL-2501 AW The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 94922048.7 | 30.06.1994 | [1996/16] | WO1994US07332 | Priority number, date | NL19930001162 | 02.07.1993 Original published format: NL 9301162 | [1996/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9501526 | Date: | 12.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0706623 | Date: | 17.04.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F16K41/10, F16J15/40, F16K41/00, F17D5/02 | [1996/16] | CPC: |
F16K41/003 (EP);
F16J15/43 (EP);
F16K41/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/16] | Title | German: | PLATZ FÜR DEN ROTIERENDEN SCHAFT EINES VENTILS | [1996/16] | English: | SEAT FOR THE ROTATING SHAFT OF A VALVE | [1996/16] | French: | JOINT DE TIGE ROTATIVE D'UNE VANNE | [1996/16] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.1996 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed | 02.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/16] | 29.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/23] | 14.01.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]GB2039333 (KLEIN, SCHANZLIN & BECKER) [X] 1,2 * page 1, line 67 - line 88; figure 1 * [A] 3,9-12,16; | [A]DE2015042 (DYNAMIT NOBEL) [A] 1-3,9-12 * page 5, paragraph L; figure .; claims 1,2 *; | [A]GB577699 (SAUNDERS VALVE COMPANY) [A] 1-3,6-10 * page 3, line 12 - line 50; figure 1 *; | [A]US4462422 (OWOC) [A] 1-4 * column 12, line 14 - line 26; figure 5 * |