EP0708793 - CYCLIC ETHER POLYMERIZATION USING SILICON COMPOUND ACCELERATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.04.1997 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington DE 19898 / US | ||
Former [1996/18] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY INCORPORATED 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DRYSDALE, Neville, Everton 227 Welsh Tract Road Newark, DE 19702-1026 / US | [1996/18] | Representative(s) | Jones, Alan John CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/18] | Jones, Alan John CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 94922098.2 | 14.07.1994 | [1996/18] | WO1994US07591 | Priority number, date | US19930093242 | 16.07.1993 Original published format: US 93242 | [1996/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9502626 | Date: | 26.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0708793 | Date: | 01.05.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C08G65/10, C08G65/04, C08G65/20 | [1996/18] | CPC: |
C08G65/20 (EP,KR,US);
C08G65/10 (KR);
C08G65/04 (EP,KR,US);
C08G65/2645 (EP,US);
C08G65/2681 (EP,US);
C08G65/269 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, NL [1996/18] | Title | German: | POLYMERISATION VON CYCLISCHEN ETHERN MIT EINEM SILICIUMBESCHLEUNIGER | [1996/18] | English: | CYCLIC ETHER POLYMERIZATION USING SILICON COMPOUND ACCELERATORS | [1996/18] | French: | POLYMERISATION D'ETHERS CYCLIQUES A L'AIDE DE COMPOSES DE SILICIUM COMME ACCELERATEURS | [1996/18] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.1995 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/18] | 29.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.11.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/23] | 07.01.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | JPH07664599 [ ] (HODOGAYA CHEMICAL CO LTD.); | [A]EP0105080 (CONOCO INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * claims 1,2 *; | [A]EP0485637 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-12 * claims 1,3,5 *; | [A]FR2212364 (KAO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-12 * page 2, line 18; example 5 * | [X] - CRIVELLO J. V. ET AL, "Novel platinum initiators for ring-opening polymerisations", DIE MAKROMOL. CHEMIE:MACROMOLECULAR SYMPOSIA, BASEL ,CH, (1992), no. 54, pages 179 - 188 [X] 1,2,4,5,13 * page 180, paragraph 3 * * page 182, line 1 - line 5 * * page 183 * | [X] - MAEDA S. ET AL, "Polymerisation catalysts for thf", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19761101), vol. 85, no. 18, Database accession no. 124661r, page 20 [X] 1,2,4,6-8 * abstract * | [A] - HAYASE S. ET AL, "Photopolymerisation of epoxys", MACROLECULES, WASHINGTON ,USA, (1985), vol. 18, no. 10, pages 1799 - 1804 [A] 1-12 |