EP0706646 - SAMPLE HOLDER AND ITS USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.01.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSTITUT FÜR MOLEKULARE BIOTECHNOLOGIE E.V. Beutenbergstrasse 11 07745 Jena / DE | For all designated states INSTITUT FÜR PHYSIKALISCHE HOCHTECHNOLOGIE E.V. Helmholtzweg 4 07743 Jena / DE | [1998/40] |
Former [1998/17] | For all designated states INSTITUT FÜR MOLEKULARE BIOLOGIE E.V. Beutenbergstrasse 11 07745 Jena / DE | ||
For all designated states INSTITUT FÜR PHYSIKALISCHE HOCHTECHNOLOGIE E.V. Helmholtzweg 4 07743 Jena / DE | |||
Former [1998/13] | For all designated states INSTITUT FÜR MOLEKULARE BIOLOGIE E.V. Beutenbergstrasse 11 07745 Jena / DE | ||
For all designated states INSTITUT FÜR PHYSIKALISCHE HOCHTECHNOLOGIE E.V. Helmholtzweg 4 07743 Jena / DE | |||
For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Berlin Hofgartenstrasse 2 80539 München / DE | |||
Former [1996/24] | For all designated states INSTITUT FÜR MOLEKULARE BIOLOGIE E.V. Beutenbergstrasse 11 D-07745 Jena / DE | ||
For all designated states INSTITUT FÜR PHYSIKALISCHE HOCHTECHNOLOGIE E.V. Helmholtzweg 4 D-07743 Jena / DE | |||
For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Berlin Hofgartenstrasse 2 D-80539 München / DE | |||
Former [1996/16] | For all designated states EVOTEC BIOSYSTEMS GMBH Grandweg 64 D-22529 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EIGEN, Manfred Georg-Dehio-Weg 14 D-37075 Göttingen / DE | 02 /
HENCO, Karsten Kirchberg 4 D-40699 Erkrath / DE | 03 /
SCHOBER, Andreas Rohlfsstrasse 12 D-99423 Weimar / DE | 04 /
SCHWIENHORST, Andreas Weender Landstrasse 68 D-37075 Göttingen / DE | 05 /
KÖHLER, Michael Talstrasse 36 D-07743 Jena / DE | 06 /
THÜRK, Marcel Greifswalder Strasse 6 D-37083 Göttingen / DE | 07 /
GÜNTHER, Rolf 11, allée Bernadotte F-92330 Sceaux / FR | 08 /
DÖRING, Michael Hopfenweg 218 D-22851 Norderstedt / DE | [1996/16] | Representative(s) | Pfeiffer, Rolf-Gerd Patentanwaltsbüro Pfeiffer & Partner Winzerlaer Strasse 10 07745 Jena / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/10] | Pfeiffer, Rolf-Gerd Patentanwälte Pfeiffer & Partner, Helmholtzweg 4 07743 Jena / DE | ||
Former [1996/16] | Hilleringmann, Jochen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) D-50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 94922254.1 | 02.07.1994 | [1996/16] | WO1994EP02173 | Priority number, date | DE19934322147 | 02.07.1993 Original published format: DE 4322147 | [1996/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9501559 | Date: | 12.01.1995 | [1995/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0706646 | Date: | 17.04.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0706646 | Date: | 25.03.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/28, B01L3/00, B01J19/00, G01N30/00, C12Q1/68 | [1996/16] | CPC: |
B01L3/50255 (EP);
B01J19/0046 (EP);
B01L3/5085 (EP);
G01N1/28 (EP);
B01J2219/00315 (EP);
B01J2219/00317 (EP);
B01J2219/00319 (EP);
B01J2219/00378 (EP);
B01J2219/0043 (EP);
B01J2219/005 (EP);
B01J2219/00585 (EP);
B01J2219/0059 (EP);
B01J2219/00596 (EP);
B01J2219/00659 (EP);
B01J2219/00689 (EP);
B01J2219/00704 (EP);
B01J2219/00722 (EP);
B01J2219/00725 (EP);
C40B40/06 (EP);
C40B40/10 (EP);
G01N2030/8813 (EP);
G01N2030/8827 (EP);
G01N2030/8831 (EP);
G01N2035/00237 (EP);
G01N30/24 (EP);
G01N30/466 (EP);
G01N30/6095 (EP);
G01N30/74 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/16] | Title | German: | PROBENTRÄGER UND SEINE VERWENDUNG | [1996/16] | English: | SAMPLE HOLDER AND ITS USE | [1996/16] | French: | PORTE-ECHANTILLONS ET SON UTILISATION | [1996/16] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.1996 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/16] | 04.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.09.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.12.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 24.12.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/11] | Request for further processing for: | 22.01.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 22.01.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.02.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 25.03.1998 | GB | 25.03.1998 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/02] | GB | 25.03.1998 | |
FR | 21.08.1998 | ||
Former [1998/52] | FR | 21.08.1998 | Cited in | International search | [DY]DE3915920 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM [DE]) [DY] 1-27,38-44 * column 3, line 23 - line 49; figure 6 *; | [Y]EP0359249 (GRACE W R & CO [US]) [Y] 1,7-9 * figure 15 *; | [A]WO8607288 (ELECTRO NUCLEONICS [US]) [A] 1,28-37 * page 6 - page 7; figure - *; | [A]EP0488947 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [Y] - Kittilsland G et al, "A sub-micron particle filter in silicon (molecular biology application)", 5TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SOLID-STATE SENSORS AND ACTUATORS AND EUROSENSORS III, MONTREUX, SWITZERLAND, 25-30 JUNE 1989, ISSN 0924-4247, SENSORS AND ACTUATORS A (PHYSICAL), APRIL 1990, SWITZERLAND, PAGE(S) 904 - 907 [Y] 1-27,38-44 * the whole document * | [DA] - S.P.A. FODOR ET AL., "Light-directed, spatially adressable parallel chemical synthesis", SCIENCE, LANCASTER, PA US, (19910215), vol. 251, pages 767 - 773 [DA] 38-44 * page 767 - page 768 * | [A] - K. SATO ET AL., "Individual and mass operation of biological cells using micromechanical silicon devices", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS A, LAUSANNE CH, (199003), vol. A22, no. 1-3, pages 948 - 953, XP000371726 |