EP0713491 - SPIRO(INDOLINO) OXAZINE PHOTOCHROMIC COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.02.2000 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.03.2000 [2000/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PILKINGTON PLC Prescot Road St. Helens Merseyside WA10 3TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/22] | For all designated states PILKINGTON PLC Prescot Road St. Helens, Merseyside WA10 3TT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RICKWOOD, Martin 303 Rabbit Run Clark's Summit Pennsylvania / US | 02 /
MARSDEN, Sean, Derek 35 Windlebrook Crescent Windle St. Helens Merseyside WA10 6DY / GB | [1996/23] |
Former [1996/22] | 01 /
RICKWOOD, Martin 6 Lansdowne Road Southport Merseyside PR8 6AJ / GB | ||
02 /
MARSDEN, Sean, Derek 35 Windlebrook Crescent Windle St. Helens Merseyside WA10 6DY / GB | Representative(s) | Pendlebury, Anthony, et al PAGE, WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | [1996/22] | Application number, filing date | 94922334.1 | 11.08.1994 | [1996/22] | WO1994GB01757 | Priority number, date | GB19930016890 | 13.08.1993 Original published format: GB 9316890 | [1996/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9505385 | Date: | 23.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0713491 | Date: | 29.05.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C07D498/22, C07D498/20, C09K9/02, G03C1/73, // (C07D498/22, 307:00, 265:00, 209:00) | [1996/22] | CPC: |
C07D498/20 (EP,KR,US);
C07D498/22 (EP,KR,US);
C09K9/02 (EP,KR,US);
G03C1/685 (EP,US);
G03C1/73 (EP,KR,US);
G03C1/733 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/22] | Title | German: | PHOTOCHROME SPIRO-INDOLIN-OXAZINE | [1996/22] | English: | SPIRO(INDOLINO) OXAZINE PHOTOCHROMIC COMPOUNDS | [1996/22] | French: | COMPOSES PHOTOCHROMIQUES DE SPIRO(INDOLINO)OXAZINE | [1996/22] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.1996 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/22] | 09.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/12] | 21.10.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0358774 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [X] 1-23; | WO8907104 [ ] (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]); | JPH0366790 [ ] (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | JPH03100091 [ ] (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [Y]EP0402228 (ESSILOR INT [FR]) [Y] 1-23; | [Y]EP0489655 (ESSILOR INT [FR]) [Y] 1-23; | [YD]EP0245020 (PILKINGTON BROTHERS PLC [GB]) [YD] 1-23 * see page 5, lines 1/2 and claim 2 *; | [Y]WO8802371 (PPG INDUSTRIES INC [US]) [Y] 1-23; | [Y]EP0350009 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-23 | [X] - YAMAMOTO,S. ET AL., "Spiroxoazine-type photochromic materials", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19920127), vol. 116, no. 4, Database accession no. 31510j, page 722, column 2 [X] 1-23 * abstract * | [X] - YAMAMOTO,K. ET AL., "Spiro-oxazine-typ photochromic material", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19920323), vol. 116, no. 12, Database accession no. 116688y, page 710, column 1 [X] 1-23 * abstract * |