EP0804620 - SLAG GRANULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.07.2001 [2001/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAVY McKEE (STOCKTON) LIMITED Ashmore House Bowesfield Lane Stockton-on-Tees Cleveland TS18 3RE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/45] | For all designated states DAVY MCKEE (STOCKTON) LIMITED Ashmore House Bowesfield Lane Stockton-on-Tees Cleveland TS18 3RE / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FEATHERSTONE, William, Barry 9 Rosedale Crescent Guisborough Cleveland TS14 8HZ / GB | [1997/45] | Representative(s) | Kirk, Geoffrey Thomas BATCHELLOR, KIRK & CO. 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/45] | Kirk, Geoffrey Thomas BATCHELLOR, KIRK & CO. 2 Pear Tree Court Farringdon Road London EC1R 0DS / GB | Application number, filing date | 94922343.2 | 11.08.1994 | [1997/45] | WO1994GB01766 | Priority number, date | GB19930016767 | 12.08.1993 Original published format: GB 9316767 | [1997/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9505485 | Date: | 23.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0804620 | Date: | 05.11.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0804620 | Date: | 26.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C21B3/08 | [1997/45] | CPC: |
C21B3/08 (EP,KR,US);
C21B2400/024 (EP,US);
C21B2400/026 (EP,US);
C21B2400/052 (EP,US);
C21B2400/054 (EP,US);
C21B2400/076 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, LU, SE [1997/45] | Title | German: | GRANULIEREN VON SCHLACKE | [1999/35] | English: | SLAG GRANULATION | [1997/45] | French: | GRANULATION DE LAITIER | [1997/45] |
Former [1997/45] | GRANULIEREN VUN SCHLACKE | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.1996 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.03.1996 | Examination requested [1997/45] | 29.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.03.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 07.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.01.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/29] | Request for further processing for: | 07.05.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 06.05.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.05.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2148330 (BRITISH STEEL CORP) [A] 1,13,20 * figure 1; claims 1-16 *; | [A]JPS5388687 ; | [A]WO9306250 (DAVY MCKEE STOCKTON [GB]) [A] 1,12,13,19 * figures 1-3; claims 1-16 *; | [A]GB1331370 (UNION CARBIDE CORP) [A] 1,13 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]GB2002820 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND) [A] 1,12,13,19 * figures 1-4; claims 1-11 *; | [A]FR746197 (EDGAR E. BROSIUS) [A] 1,13 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0068943 (CLESID SA [FR]) [A] 1,13 * figures 1,2 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19781013), vol. 2, no. 122, Database accession no. (C - 024), & JP53088687 A 19780804 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND) [A] 1,3,13,20 * abstract * |