EP0711168 - METHODS OF TREATING APOPTOSIS AND ASSOCIATED CONDITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.09.1998 [1998/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LXR BIOTECHNOLOGY INC. 1401 Marina Way South Richmond, CA 94804 / US | [1996/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOMEI, L., David 27 Seabreeze Dr. , Marine Bay Richmond, CA 94804 / US | [1996/20] | Representative(s) | Goldin, Douglas Michael J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/20] | Goldin, Douglas Michael J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 94922680.7 | 22.07.1994 | [1996/20] | WO1994US08268 | Priority number, date | US19930096788 | 23.07.1993 Original published format: US 96788 | [1996/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9503054 | Date: | 02.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0711168 | Date: | 15.05.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.02.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/495, A61K31/44 | [1996/20] | CPC: |
A61K31/495 (EP,KR);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/20] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VPN APOPTOSE UND DAMIT VERBUNDENEN ZUSTAENDEN | [1996/20] | English: | METHODS OF TREATING APOPTOSIS AND ASSOCIATED CONDITIONS | [1996/20] | French: | PROCEDES DE TRAITEMENT DE L'APOPTOSE ET D'ETATS ASSOCIES | [1996/20] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.1996 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.1996 | Search fee paid | 14.02.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 14.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/20] | 24.03.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1998/36] | 26.04.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1997 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9208460 (WINDLESHAW ENTERPRISES LTD [GB]) [X] 1-3,10,11 * the whole document *; | [X] - TANABE ET AL., "Inhibition of Topoisomerase II by Antitumor Agents Bis(2,6-dioxopiperazine) Derivatives", CANCER RESEARCH, (1991), vol. 51, pages 4903 - 4908, XP002046914 [X] 1,10 * the whole document * | [X] - SEHESTED ET AL., "ANTAGONISTIC EFFECT OF THE CARDIOPROTECTOR (+)-1,2-BIS(3,5-DIOXOPIPERAZINYL-1-YL)PROPANE (ICRF-187) ON DNA BREAKS AND CYTOTOXICITY INDUCED BY THE TOPOISOMERASE II DIRECTED DRUGS DAUNORUBICIN AND ETOPOSIDE (VP-16)", BIOCHEMICAL PHARMACOL., (1993), vol. 46, no. 3, pages 389 - 393, XP002046915 [X] 1-5,10,11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0006-2952(93)90514-W | [X] - CHACHOUA ET AL., "Phase II trial of ICRF-187 in patients with acquired immune deficiency related Kaposi's Sarcoma (AIDS-KS)", INVEST. NEW DRUGS, (1989), vol. 7, no. 4, pages 327 - 332, XP002046916 [X] 1-4,10,11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00173762 | [X] - HELLMAN K., "Effect of ICRF 159 on Immune Responses.", PROC. ROY. SOC. MED., (1972), vol. 65, no. 3, pages 264 - 265, XP002046917 [X] 1-3,10 * the whole document * | [X] - DUKE ET AL., "Immunosuppression by the Bisdioxopiperazines ICRF 154 and 159", BIOMEDICINE, (1973), vol. 18, no. 3, pages 199 - 205, XP002046918 [X] 1-3,10 * the whole document * | [X] - HAUG ET AL., "Simultaneous assessment of migration and proliferation of murine fibrosarcoma cells, as affected by hydroxyurea, vinblastine, cytochalasin B, razoxane and interferon.", CELL PROLIFERATION, vol. 26, no. 3, pages 251 - 261, XP002046919 [X] 1-3,10 * the whole document * | [X] - BU'LOCK ET AL., "Cardioprotection by ICRF187 against high dose anthracycline toxicity in children with malignant disease", BRITISH HEART JOURNAL, (1993), vol. 70, no. 2, pages 185 - 188, XP002046920 [X] 1-3,5,6,10,11 * the whole document * | [X] - HERMAN ET AL., "Protective Effect of ICRF-187 on Doxorubicin-Induced Cardiac and Renal Toxicity in Spontaneously Hypertensive (SHR) and Normotensive (WKY) Rats", TOXICOL. APPL. PHARMACOL., (1988), vol. 92, no. 1, pages 42 - 53, XP002046921 [X] 1-3,5,10,11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0041-008X(88)90226-8 | [X] - HERMAN ET AL., "Timing of treatment with ICRF-187 and its effect on chronic doxorubicin cardiotoxicity.", CANCER CHEMOTHER. PHARMACOL., (1993), vol. 32, no. 6, pages 445 - 449, XP002046922 [X] 1-3,10,11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00685888 | [X] - HERMANN ET AL., "Examination of the potential long-lasting protective effect of ICRF-187 against anthracycline-induced chronic cardiomyopathy", CANCER TREAT. REVIEWS, (1990), vol. 17, no. 2-3, pages 155 - 160, XP002046923 [X] 1-3,10,11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0305-7372(90)90040-M | [PX] - ONISHI ET AL., "BIS(2,6-DIOXOPIPERAXINE) DERIVATIVES, TOPOISOMERASE ii INHIBITORS WHICH DO NOT FORM A DNA CLEAVABLE COMPLEX, INDUCE THYMOCYTE APOPTOSIS", BIOCHEM. MOL. BIOL. INT., (1994), vol. 32, no. 1, pages 115 - 122, XP002046924 [PX] 1,2,10 * the whole document * | International search | [X]WO9100729 (NAT RES DEV [GB]) | [X] - ONCOLOGY, Volume 6, No. 6, issued June 1992, (California, US), R.W. CARLSON: "Reducing the Cardiotoxicity of the Anthracyclines", pages 95-100, see the entire document. |