EP0706547 - ELASTOMERIC ADHESIVE FOAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.08.1999 [1999/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/16] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LITCHHOLT, John, Joseph 101 Hopping Court Harrison, OH 45030 / US | 02 /
LODGE, Richard, Worthington 11978 Stonequarry Court Cincinnati, OH 45251 / US | [1996/16] | Representative(s) | Hirsch, Uwe T., et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/16] | Hirsch, Uwe Thomas, et al Procter & Gamble GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 D-65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 94923186.4 | 08.06.1994 | [1996/16] | WO1994US06477 | Priority number, date | US19930085537 | 30.06.1993 Original published format: US 85537 | [1996/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9501408 | Date: | 12.01.1995 | [1995/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0706547 | Date: | 17.04.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0706547 | Date: | 19.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C09J153/02, C09J5/08 | [1996/16] | CPC: |
C08J9/30 (EP,US);
C09J153/02 (EP,US);
C09J5/08 (EP,US);
C08J2353/02 (EP,US);
C08L2666/04 (EP,US);
C08L2666/28 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C09J153/02, C08L2666/04, C08L2666/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1998/16] |
Former [1996/16] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | ELASTOMERISCHER KLEBESCHAUM | [1996/16] | English: | ELASTOMERIC ADHESIVE FOAM | [1996/16] | French: | MOUSSE ADHESIVE ELASTOMERE | [1996/16] | Entry into regional phase | 30.12.1995 | National basic fee paid | 30.12.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.12.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/16] | 06.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/32] | Request for further processing for: | 16.09.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 16.09.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.10.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB2107573 (PAPER CONVERTING MACHINE CO) [Y] 1-8 * claims 1-7 *; | [A]EP0368141 (FULLER H B CO [US]) [A] 1-8* claims 1-22 *; | [Y]WO9310734 (FULLER H B LICENSING FINANC [US]) [Y] 1-8 * the whole document * |