EP0707669 - IMPROVED ABSORBENT ACRYLIC SPUNLACED FABRIC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.06.1999 [1999/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/17] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PETERSON, Robert, Howe 102 Blueridge Tracee Hendersonville, TN 37075 / US | 02 /
SUMMERS, James, Thomas 1066 Hillview Drive Hendersonville, TN 37075 / US | [1996/17] | Representative(s) | Woodman, Derek, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/17] | Woodman, Derek, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. European Patent Attorneys Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 94923321.7 | 07.07.1994 | [1996/17] | WO1994US07512 | Priority number, date | US19930089871 | 09.07.1993 Original published format: US 89871 | [1996/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9502083 | Date: | 19.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0707669 | Date: | 24.04.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0707669 | Date: | 17.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | D04H1/44, D04H13/00 | [1996/17] | CPC: |
A61F13/531 (EP,US);
D04H1/44 (EP,KR,US);
A61F13/15268 (EP,US);
A61F5/485 (EP,US);
A61L15/24 (EP,US);
A61L15/28 (EP,US);
B32B5/26 (EP,US);
D04H1/4374 (EP,US);
D04H1/492 (EP,US);
D04H1/498 (EP,US);
D04H13/00 (KR);
A61F2013/15447 (EP,US);
A61F2013/51066 (EP,US);
A61F2013/530036 (EP,US);
A61F2013/530138 (EP,US);
A61F2013/530167 (EP,US);
A61F2013/53035 (EP,US);
A61F2013/8414 (EP,US);
Y10S428/913 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24322 (EP,US);
Y10T442/608 (EP,US);
Y10T442/635 (EP,US);
Y10T442/666 (EP,US);
Y10T442/686 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61L15/24, C08L33/20 (EP,US);
A61L15/28, C08L1/02 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1996/17] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTER ABSORBIERENDER WIRKFASERVLIESSTOFF AUS ACRYL | [1996/17] | English: | IMPROVED ABSORBENT ACRYLIC SPUNLACED FABRIC | [1996/17] | French: | TISSU A FILAMENTS ENTREMELES ACRYLIQUE ABSORBANT AMELIORE | [1996/17] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.1995 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/17] | 29.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.12.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3485709 (EVANS FRANKLIN JAMES, et al) [A] 1,5 * column 2, line 44 - column 3, line 33 *; | [A]EP0311344 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 9; | [A]EP0423619 (FIBERWEB NORTH AMERICA INC [US]) [A] 1 * claims 1-9 *; | [A]US5085653 (LEVY HARRY [US]) [A] 6,8* column 2, line 31 - column 3, line 54 *; | [A]EP0540041 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [A] 1,2 * page 4, line 36 - page 6, line 25 * |