EP0663792 - SOILLESS CULTIVATION SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 14.06.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISOVER SAINT-GOBAIN 18, avenue d'Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [1999/24] |
Former [1995/30] | For all designated states ISOVER SAINT-GOBAIN 18, avenue d'Alsace F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAFKA, Bernard 3, rue du Grand-Cerf Auvillers F-60290 Rantigny / FR | 02 /
VELDHUIZEN, Theunis Roghorst 189 NL-6708 KH Wageningen / NL | [1995/30] | Representative(s) | Le Vaguerèse, Sylvain Jacques, et al SAINT-GOBAIN RECHERCHE 39 Quai Lucien Lefranc 93304 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Le Vaguerèse, Sylvain Jacques, et al SAINT-GOBAIN RECHERCHE 39 Quai Lucien Lefranc 93304 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1995/30] | Le Vaguerèse, Sylvain Jacques, et al SAINT-GOBAIN RECHERCHE 39, quai Lucien Lefranc F-93300 Aubervilliers Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 94923748.1 | 27.07.1994 | [1995/30] | WO1994FR00945 | Priority number, date | FR19930009821 | 10.08.1993 Original published format: FR 9309821 | [1995/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9504453 | Date: | 16.02.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0663792 | Date: | 26.07.1995 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.02.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0663792 | Date: | 16.06.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A01G31/00 | [1995/30] | CPC: |
A01G24/18 (EP,US);
A01G24/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, LI, NL, PT, SE [1995/30] | Title | German: | ERDLOSER KULTURSUBSTRAT | [1995/30] | English: | SOILLESS CULTIVATION SUBSTRATE | [1995/30] | French: | SUBSTRAT DE CULTURE HORS-SOL | [1995/30] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.1995 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.1995 | Examination requested [1995/49] | 14.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.11.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.03.2000
18.04.2000
ADMISSIBLE ROCKWOOL INTERNATIONAL A/S Hovedgaden 584 2640 Hedehusene / DK Opponent's representative Prins, Hendrik Willem Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.03.2000
18.04.2000
ADMISSIBLE ROCKWOOL INTERNATIONAL A/S Hovedgaden 584 DK-2640 Hedehusene / DK Opponent's representative Prins, Hendrik Willem Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK The Hague / NL | ||
Former [2000/20] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.03.2000
ROCKWOOL International A/S Hovedgaden 584 DK-2640 Hedehusene / DK Opponent's representative Prins, Hendrik Willem Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | 25.04.2000 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.10.2000 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 29.01.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.01.2002 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2002/31] | 27.02.2002 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 27.02.2002 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 29.09.1995 | M01   Fee paid on   07.10.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 16.06.1999 | CH | 31.07.1999 | LI | 31.07.1999 | PT | 16.09.1999 | [2003/13] |
Former [2000/52] | CH | 31.07.1999 | |
LI | 31.07.1999 | ||
PT | 16.09.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | PT | 16.09.1999 | |
CH | 18.02.2000 | ||
LI | 18.02.2000 | ||
Former [2000/25] | PT | 16.09.1999 | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0388287 (SAINT GOBAIN ISOVER [FR]) [DA] 1,4,7,11,12 * abstract * * column 3, line 22 - column 4, line 8 * * column 4, line 37 - line 44; figures 1,2,4 *; | [DA]EP0310501 (SAINT GOBAIN ISOVER [FR]) [DA] 3-8 * column 7, line 9 - line 30 * * claims 1-4,6,8,10-12 *; | [DA]EP0133083 (SAINT GOBAIN ISOVER [FR]) [DA] 11,12 * column 2, line 9 - line 23 * * figures 1-4; claims 1-3 *; | [A]WO9210602 (ROCKWOOL INT [DK]) [A] 1,8,10-12 * abstract * * page 4, line 30 - line 32 * * page 7, line 12 - line 16; figure . * |