EP0738350 - RESILIENT RAILWAY FASTENING CLIP RESISTING LOOSENING OR REMOVAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rex, Robert John Tullamore Montacute, S.A. 5134 / AU | [1996/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1996/43] | Representative(s) | Maury, Richard Philip, et al Scott & York Intellectual Property Ltd 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans Hertfordshire, AL1 3AW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Maury, Richard Philip, et al Scott & York Intellectual Property Ltd 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans Hertfordshire, AL1 3AW / GB | ||
Former [1999/16] | Maury, Richard Philip, et al Sommerville & Rushton, Business Link Building, 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans, Herts AL1 3AW / GB | ||
Former [1996/43] | Sommerville, John Henry, et al Sommerville & Rushton, 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans, Herts AL1 3AW / GB | Application number, filing date | 94924151.7 | 12.08.1994 | [1996/43] | WO1994AU00470 | Priority number, date | AU1994PM03300 | 10.01.1994 Original published format: AU PM330094 | [1996/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9518888 | Date: | 13.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0738350 | Date: | 23.10.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0738350 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 13.07.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | E01B9/30, E01B9/34, E01B9/48 | [1996/43] | CPC: |
E01B9/306 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/43] | Title | German: | EISENBAHNSCHIENENBEFESTIGUNGSKLAMMER, DIE GEGEN LÖSEN UND ENTFERNEN BESTÄNDIG IST | [1996/43] | English: | RESILIENT RAILWAY FASTENING CLIP RESISTING LOOSENING OR REMOVAL | [1996/43] | French: | AGRAFE DE FIXATION ELASTIQUE POUR CHEMIN DE FER, RESISTANT AU DESSERRAGE ET AU DEMONTAGE | [1996/43] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.1996 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.1996 | Search fee paid | 23.07.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 23.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/43] | 20.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.12.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.10.2001 | BE | 31.10.2001 | CH | 31.10.2001 | FR | 31.10.2001 | LI | 31.10.2001 | NL | 31.10.2001 | DK | 31.01.2002 | SE | 31.01.2002 | DE | 01.02.2002 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/45] | AT | 31.10.2001 | |
BE | 31.10.2001 | ||
CH | 31.10.2001 | ||
LI | 31.10.2001 | ||
NL | 31.10.2001 | ||
DK | 31.01.2002 | ||
SE | 31.01.2002 | ||
DE | 01.02.2002 | ||
Former [2003/30] | AT | 31.10.2001 | |
BE | 31.10.2001 | ||
CH | 31.10.2001 | ||
LI | 31.10.2001 | ||
NL | 31.10.2001 | ||
SE | 31.01.2002 | ||
DE | 01.02.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 31.10.2001 | |
BE | 31.10.2001 | ||
CH | 31.10.2001 | ||
LI | 31.10.2001 | ||
NL | 31.10.2001 | ||
SE | 31.01.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | BE | 31.10.2001 | |
CH | 31.10.2001 | ||
LI | 31.10.2001 | ||
NL | 31.10.2001 | ||
SE | 31.01.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | CH | 31.10.2001 | |
LI | 31.10.2001 | ||
SE | 31.01.2002 | ||
Former [2002/26] | SE | 31.01.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]AU5394679 (EVERTS & VAN DER WEYDEN NV) [A] 1-6* figure - *; | [XAY]FR2475086 (SCHWIHAG GMBH [CH]) [X] 1,2,6 * page 8, line 7 - page 10, line 4; figure - * [A] 4,5 [Y] 3; | [DYA]US4801084 (REX ALBERT E [AU]) [DY] 3 * figure - * [A] 1,2,4-6 | International search | [A]DE1188637 (VOSSLOH WERKE GMBH); | [A]FR2262153 (SCHROEFBOUTENFABRIEK VH EVERTS [NL]); | [A]GB2085057 (PANDROL LTD); | [A]AU5291686 (PANDROL AUSTRALIA PTY LTD) |