EP0724437 - ANTHELMINTIC FORMULATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.1998 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.11.1998 [1998/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASHMONT HOLDINGS LIMITED 48 Diana Drive, Glenfield Auckland 1310 / NZ | [N/P] |
Former [1996/32] | For all designated states ASHMONT HOLDINGS LIMITED 48 Diana Drive Glenfield, Auckland 1310 / NZ | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARVEY, Colin, Manson 44 Raymond Terrace Birkenhead Auckland 1310 / NZ | [1996/32] | Representative(s) | Lyons, Andrew John, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Tower Building Water Street Liverpool L3 1BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/32] | Lyons, Andrew John, et al ROYSTONS Tower Building Water Street Liverpool L3 1BA / GB | Application number, filing date | 94924428.9 | 22.08.1994 | [1996/32] | WO1994NZ00084 | Priority number, date | NZ19930248486 | 24.08.1993 Original published format: NZ 24848693 | [1996/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9505812 | Date: | 02.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0724437 | Date: | 07.08.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 02.03.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/275, A61K31/365, A61K47/10, // (A61K31/365, 31:275) | [1998/28] | CPC: |
A61K31/70 (EP);
A61K47/10 (EP);
A61K47/22 (EP);
A61K9/0019 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/70, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/70, A61K31/275 (EP) |
Former IPC [1996/32] | A61K31/16, A61K31/365 | Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, NL, PT [1996/32] | Title | German: | ANTHELMINTISCHE FORMULIERUNGEN | [1996/32] | English: | ANTHELMINTIC FORMULATIONS | [1996/32] | French: | FORMULATIONS ANTI-HELMINTHIQUES | [1996/32] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.1996 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.1996 | Search fee paid | 13.02.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 13.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/32] | 28.09.1998 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1998/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1998 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4470979 (VAN GESTEL JOZEF F E [BE]) [X] 1-9 *cf. col. 1, lines 20-68, claims*; | [X]EP0427582 (CROOKS MICHAEL JOHN [AU]) [X] 1-9 *cf. abstract, page 2, lines 32-46, page 5, table 1A, claims*; | [E]WO9428887 (UNIV AUSTRALIAN [AU], et al) [E] 1-9 * cf. abstract, page 4, lines 6-24, page 6, 4th para., page 12, last para., bridging with page 13, lines 1-5, claims 1-9* | International search | [A]AU6453390 (CROOKS MICHAEL JOHN); | [A]US4470979 (VAN GESTEL JOZEF F E [BE]); | [A]SU1782593 | [A] - DERWENT ABSTRACT, Accession No. 94-014506/02, Class B05; & SU,A,1 782 593, (IVAN AGRIC RES INST), 23 December 1992., & SU1782593 A 00000000 |