EP0665816 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING AMMONIUM ZEOLITES OF LOW ALKALI METAL CONTENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2001 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 06.06.2001 [2001/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PQ Corporation Valley Forge Executive Mall P.O. Box 840 Valley Forge, PA 19482 / US | [1995/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COOPER, David, A. 124 Harper Avenue Morrisville, PA 19067 / US | [1995/32] | Representative(s) | Weisert, Annekäte, et al Patentanwälte Kraus & Weisert Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/32] | Weisert, Annekäte, Dipl.-Ing. Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Kraus Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 D-80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94924479.2 | 20.07.1994 | [1995/32] | WO1994US08181 | Priority number, date | US19930094737 | 22.07.1993 Original published format: US 94737 | [1995/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9503248 | Date: | 02.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0665816 | Date: | 09.08.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0665816 | Date: | 09.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.02.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C01B39/02, B01J29/08 | [1996/06] | CPC: |
B01J37/30 (EP,US);
C01B39/20 (KR);
B01J29/084 (EP,US);
Y10S423/21 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/32] | C01B33/34, B01J29/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/32] | Extension states | SI | 06.04.1995 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON AMMONIUMZEOLITHEN MIT NIEDRIGEM ALKALIMETALLGEHALT | [1995/32] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING AMMONIUM ZEOLITES OF LOW ALKALI METAL CONTENT | [1995/32] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE ZEOLITES AMMONIACAUX A FAIBLE TENEUR EN METAUX ALCALINS | [1995/32] | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.1995 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.1995 | Search fee paid | 06.04.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/32] | 31.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.09.1998 | GR | 09.09.1998 | PT | 14.12.1998 | [2001/23] |
Former [1999/34] | AT | 09.09.1998 | |
PT | 14.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/29] | PT | 14.12.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [XY]US2617712 (BOND JR GEORGE R); | [A]US3595611 (MCDANIEL CARL VANCE, et al); | [A]US3607043 (MCDANIEL CARL VANCE, et al); | [A]US3640680 (KOKOTAILO GEORGE T, et al); | [A]US3677698 (SHERRY HOWARD S, et al); | [A]US3696276 (BOLAND BERNARD W); | [Y]US4069172 (KANAOKA MASAZUMI, et al); | [A]US4224188 (ALAFANDI HAMID, et al); | [A]US4265788 (EBITANI ATSUSHI, et al); | [A]US4388224 (MOOREHEAD ERIC L); | [Y]US4393082 (WHITE JOE L, et al); | [Y]US4922039 (YAMADA BUNSHI [JP], et al) | [A] - J. of Physical Chemistry, Volume 70, No. 4, published April 1970, H.S. SHERRY, "The Ion-Exchange Properties of Zeolites. I. Univalent Ion Exchange in Synthetic Faujasite", pages 1158-1168. |