EP0711158 - METHOD OF TREATING ATHEROSCLEROSIS OR RESTENOSIS USING MICROTUBULE STABILIZING AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 20.06.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE GOVERNMENT OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, as represented by THE SECRETARY, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES The National Institute of Health, Office of Technology Transfer, 6011 Executive Boulevard, Suite 325 Rockville, MD 20852 / US | [2008/30] |
Former [2003/49] | For all designated states THE GOVERNMENT OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, as represented by THE SECRETARY, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES The National Institute of Health, Office of Technology Transfer, 6011 Executive Boulevard, Suite 325 Rockville, MD 20852 / US | ||
Former [1996/20] | For all designated states THE GOVERNMENT OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, as represented by THE SECRETARY, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES National Institutes of Health, Office of Technology Transfer, Box 13, 6011 Executive Boulevard, Suite 325 Rockville, MD 20852 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KINSELLA, James L. 412 Old Trail Baltimore, MD 21212 / US | 02 /
SOLLOTT, Steven J. 2373 Sundew Terrace Baltimore, MD 21209 / US | [1996/20] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/20] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94924519.5 | 29.07.1994 | [1996/20] | WO1994US08578 | Priority number, date | US19930099067 | 29.07.1993 Original published format: US 99067 | [1996/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9503795 | Date: | 09.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0711158 | Date: | 15.05.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0711158 | Date: | 03.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/49] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0711158 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/337, A61K33/00, A61P9/10 | [2003/14] | CPC: |
A61K31/337 (EP,US);
A61K31/335 (EP,US);
A61L31/16 (EP,US);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
A61K9/0024 (EP,US);
A61L2300/416 (EP,US);
A61L2300/602 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1996/20] | A61K31/335, A61K31/54, A61K31/535, A61K31/495, A61K31/445, A61K31/40 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/20] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG ATHEROSKLEROSE ODER RESTENOSE MIT HILFE EINES MIKROTUBULUSSTABILISATORS | [2003/48] | English: | METHOD OF TREATING ATHEROSCLEROSIS OR RESTENOSIS USING MICROTUBULE STABILIZING AGENT | [1996/20] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE L'ATHEROSCLEROSE OU DE LA RESTENOSE AU MOYEN D'UN AGENT DE STABILISATION DES MICROTUBULES | [1996/20] |
Former [1996/20] | METHODE ZUR BEHANDLUNG ARTHEROSCLEROSE ODER RESTENOSE MIT HILFE EINES MIKROTUBULSTASBILISATORES | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.1996 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/20] | 16.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.10.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP00128626.9 / EP1118325 | EP05027952.0 / EP1649853 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.09.2004
10.09.2004
ADMISSIBLE CONOR MEDSYSTEMS 1003 Hamilton Court Menlo Park, CA94025 / US Opponent's representative Bijvank, Koen Mattijs Lodewiek, et al, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | 02
03.09.2004
26.10.2004
ADMISSIBLE B. Braun Melsungen AG Carl-Braun-Str.1 34212 Melsungen / DE Opponent's representative Arth, Hans-Lothar, et al, et al ABK Patent Attorneys Jasminweg 9 14052 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/24] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.09.2004
10.09.2004
ADMISSIBLE CONOR MEDSYSTEMS 1003 Hamilton Court Menlo Park, CA94025 / US Opponent's representative Bijvank, Koen Mattijs Lodewiek, et al, et al Vereenigde P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | ||
02
03.09.2004
26.10.2004
ADMISSIBLE B. Braun Melsungen AG Carl-Braun-Str.1 34212 Melsungen / DE Opponent's representative Arth, Hans-Lothar, et al, et al ABK Patent Attorneys Jasminweg 9 14052 Berlin / DE | |||
Former [2006/24] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.09.2004
10.09.2004
ADMISSIBLE CONOR MEDSYSTEMS 1003 Hamilton Court Menlo Park, CA94025 / US Opponent's representative Bijvank, Koen Mattijs Lodewiek, et al, et al Vereenigde P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | ||
02
03.09.2004
26.10.2004
ADMISSIBLE B. Braun Melsungen AG Carl-Braun-Str.1 34212 Melsungen / DE Opponent's representative Arth, Hans-Lothar, et al, et al Arth, Bucher & Kollegen Patentanwälte Am Klopferspitz 19 (IZB) 82152 München-Martiensried / DE | |||
Former [2005/45] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.09.2004
10.09.2004
ADMISSIBLE CONOR MEDSYSTEMS 1003 Hamilton Court Menlo Park, CA94025 / US Opponent's representative Helbig, Christian, Dr. Dipl.-Biol. Frohwitter Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Possartstrasse 20 81679 München / DE | ||
02
03.09.2004
26.10.2004
ADMISSIBLE B. Braun Melsungen AG Carl-Braun-Str.1 34212 Melsungen / DE Opponent's representative Arth, Hans-Lothar, et al, et al Arth, Bucher & Kollegen Patentanwälte Am Klopferspitz 19 (IZB) 82152 München-Martiensried / DE | |||
Former [2005/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.09.2004
10.09.2004
ADMISSIBLE CONOR MEDSYSTEMS 1003 Hamilton Court Menlo Park, CA94025 / US Opponent's representative Helbig, Christian, Dr. Dipl.-Biol. Frohwitter Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Possartstrasse 20 81679 München / DE | ||
02
03.09.2004
26.10.2004
ADMISSIBLE B. Braun Melsungen AG Carl-Braun-Str.1 34212 Melsungen / DE Opponent's representative Arth, Hans-Lothar, et al, et al Arth, Bucher & Kollegen, Am Klopferspitz 19 82152 Martinsried / DE | |||
Former [2004/45] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.09.2004
10.09.2004
ADMISSIBLE CONOR MEDSYSTEMS 1003 Hamilton Court Menlo Park, CA94025 / US Opponent's representative Helbig, Christian, Dr. Dipl.-Biol. Frohwitter Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Possartstrasse 20 81679 München / DE | ||
02
03.09.2004
B. Braun Melsungen AG Carl-Braun-Str.1 34212 Melsungen / DE Opponent's representative Hinz, Claus-Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. Walther, Walther & Hinz, Patentanwälte - European Patent Attorneys Postfach 41 01 45 34063 Kassel / DE | |||
Former [2004/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.09.2004
10.09.2004
ADMISSIBLE CONOR MEDSYSTEMS 1003 Hamilton Court Menlo Park, CA94025 / US Opponent's representative Helbig, Christian, Dr. Dipl.-Biol. Frohwitter Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Possartstrasse 20 81679 München / DE | ||
02
03.09.2004
B. Braun Melsungen AG Carl-Braun-Str.1 34212 Melsungen / DE Opponent's representative WALTHER, WALTHER & HINZ Patentanwälte Heimradstrasse 2 34130 Kassel / DE | 02.11.2004 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.11.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.10.2007 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 25.10.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.11.2007 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 22.11.2007 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 13.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 09.06.2008 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Request for further processing for: | 22.12.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 22.12.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.01.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1998 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   05.10.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DYX]US5157049 (HAUGWITZ RUDIGER D [US], et al) [DY] 1-11,14-24 * the whole document * * the whole document *[X] 12,13 | [XY] - CHALDAKOV G. N., "Antitubulins- A New Therapeutic Approach for Atherosclerosis?", ATHEROSCLEROSIS, (1982), vol. 44, pages 385 - 90 [X] 1,4,7,10-12,14,17,20,23,24 * the whole document * * the whole document * [Y] 2,3,5,6,8,9,13,15,16,18,19,21,22 | [XY] - BARD ET AL, "Normolipemic Activities of Acrylophenone Derivatives with Antimicrotubular Properties", METH. AND FIND. CLIN. PHARMACOL., (1985), vol. 7, no. 4, pages 183 - 7 [X] 1,4,7,10-12,14,17,20,23,24 * page 186 * * the whole document * [Y] 2,3,5,6,8,9,13,15,16,18,19,21,22 | [DXY] - CURRIER ET AL, "Colchicine Inhibits Restenosis After Iliac Angioplasty in the Atherosclerotic Rabbit", CIRCULATION, (1989), vol. 80/S-II, page 66 [DX] 1,4,7,10-12,14,17,20,23,24 * the whole document * * the whole document * [Y] 2,3,5,6,8,9,13,15,16,18,19,21,22 | [Y] - LÖVQUIST ET AL, "Pathophysiological Mechanism for Restenosis Following Coronary Angioplasty: Possible Preventive Alternatives", J. OF INT. MED., (1993), vol. 233, pages 215 - 26 [Y] 1-11,14-24 * page 221, column 2, paragraph 2 * | [X] - The Merck Index, MERCK CO. INC., (1989) [X] 12,13 * no.9049; page 1435 * |