EP0730627 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RECYCLING WASTE CONTAINING PLASTIC AND/OR ORGANIC MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.08.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.1998 | Refusal of application | published on 14.10.1998 [1998/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PPV VERWALTUNGS AG Fröbelstrasse 33 8032 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1996/37] | For all designated states PPV-VERWALTUNGS-AG Fröbelstrasse 33 8032 Zürich 7 / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PÖSCHL, Günter Tribergle 2 D-71409 Schwaikheim / DE | [1996/37] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1998/05] |
Former [1996/37] | Menges, Rolf, Dipl.-Ing., et al Ackmann & Menges Patentanwälte Postfach 14 04 31 80454 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94924857.9 | 09.08.1994 | [1996/37] | WO1994EP02631 | Priority number, date | DE19934327958 | 19.08.1993 Original published format: DE 4327958 | [1996/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9505431 | Date: | 23.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0730627 | Date: | 11.09.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C10B19/00, C10B53/00, H05B6/72, B01J19/12 | [1996/37] | CPC: |
B01J3/006 (EP);
B01J19/126 (EP);
C10B55/00 (EP);
H05H1/46 (EP);
B01J2219/0894 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR RÜCKGEWINNUNG VON KUNSTSTOFF UND/ODER ORGANISCHES MATERIAL ENTHALTENDEN ABFÄLLEN | [1996/37] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RECYCLING WASTE CONTAINING PLASTIC AND/OR ORGANIC MATERIAL | [1996/37] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE RECYCLAGE DE DECHETS CONTENANT DES MATIERES PLASTIQUES ET/OU ORGANIQUES | [1996/37] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.1996 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/37] | 07.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.05.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1998/42] | 25.05.1998 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1998/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 24.05.1996 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   24.06.1996 | 24.05.1996 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   24.06.1996 | 24.05.1996 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   24.06.1996 | 24.05.1996 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   24.06.1996 | 24.05.1996 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   24.06.1996 | 24.05.1996 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   24.06.1996 | 24.05.1996 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   24.06.1996 | 24.05.1996 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   24.06.1996 | 24.05.1996 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   24.06.1996 | 24.05.1996 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   24.06.1996 | 24.05.1996 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   24.06.1996 | 24.05.1996 | LI   M01   Fee paid on   24.06.1996 | 24.05.1996 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   24.06.1996 | 24.05.1996 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   24.06.1996 | 24.05.1996 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   24.06.1996 | 24.05.1996 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   24.06.1996 | 24.05.1996 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   24.06.1996 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 24.05.1996 | M01   Fee paid on   24.06.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE4202862 (BARICH ET AL.) [Y] 1,2,6,7 * claims 1-7,13,15,16,20,24-28 *; | [Y]JPS618134 ; | [A]WO9104104 (CREATIVE SYSTEMS ENGINEERING) [A] 1-5; | [A]US3843457 (GRANNEN ET AL) [A] 1,2; | [A]WO9202598 (HOLLAND) [A] 6-14; | [A]EP0426926 (CORNESCU) [A] 3-5,7 * figure 6; claim - *; | [A]US3758737 (IRONFIELD) [A] 7-9 * column 3, line 62 - column 3, line 64; figures 1,2 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860529), vol. 10, no. 148, Database accession no. (C - 350)<2205> , & JP61008134 A 19860114 (TOSHIBA) [Y] 1,2,6,7 * abstract * |