EP0739499 - METHOD OF FORMING POLYIMIDE PATTERNS ON SUBSTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2001 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION 360 Rainbow Boulevard South ,Box 728 Niagara Falls, N.Y. 14302 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/44] | For all designated states Occidental Chemical Corporation 360 Rainbow Boulevard South ,Box 728 Niagara Falls, N.Y. 14302 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOI, Jin-O 253 Wueth Drive Getzville, NY 14068 / US | [1996/44] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/44] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94925107.8 | 25.07.1994 | [1996/44] | WO1994US08359 | Priority number, date | US19930134707 | 12.10.1993 Original published format: US 134707 | [1996/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9510797 | Date: | 20.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0739499 | Date: | 30.10.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0739499 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/038, G03F7/023 | [1996/44] | CPC: |
G03F7/0233 (EP,US);
G03F7/038 (KR);
B41M1/12 (EP,US);
C09D179/08 (EP,US);
G03F7/0387 (EP,US);
H01L21/4867 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1996/44] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYIMID-MUSTERN AUF SUBSTRATEN | [1996/44] | English: | METHOD OF FORMING POLYIMIDE PATTERNS ON SUBSTRATES | [1996/44] | French: | PROCEDE DE FORMATION DE MOTIFS DE POLYIMIDE SUR DES SUBSTRATS | [1996/44] | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.1996 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/44] | 05.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 08.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 19.10.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.06.1996 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   04.06.1996 | 03.06.1996 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   04.06.1996 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 03.06.1996 | M01   Fee paid on   04.06.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH05140306 ; | [YD]EP0224680 (IBM [US]) [YD] 1-19 * page 5, line 15 - line 27; claims 1,3,4,14 * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 27, Database accession no. 93-216899, & JPH05140306 A 19930608 (SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO) [Y] 1-19 * abstract * |