EP0719448 - FIBEROPTIC PRESSURE SENSOR HAVING DRIFT CORRECTING MEANS FOR IN SITU CALIBRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.06.2000 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.08.2000 [2000/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C.R. BARD, INC. 730 Central Avenue Murray Hill New Jersey 07974 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/10] | For all designated states C.R. BARD, INC. 730 Central Avenue Murray Hill New Jersey 07974 / US | ||
Former [1996/27] | For all designated states Bard FiberOptic Technologies, Inc. 30600 Telegraph Road Bingham Farms, Michigan 48025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WLODARCZYK, Marek, T. 6865 Vachon Drive Bloomfield Hills, Michigan I / US | 02 /
DANIELSON, David, O. 4839 Cottonwood Lane Chelsea, MI 48118 / US | [1996/36] |
Former [1996/27] | 01 /
WLODARCZYK, Marek, T. 6865 Vachon Drive Birmingham, MI 48010 / US | ||
02 /
DANIELSON, David, O. 4839 Cottonwood Lane Chelsea, MI 48118 / US | Representative(s) | Nicholls, Michael John J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/27] | Nicholls, Michael John J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 94925140.9 | 29.07.1994 | [1996/27] | WO1994US08570 | Priority number, date | US19930121182 | 14.09.1993 Original published format: US 121182 | [1996/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9508183 | Date: | 23.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0719448 | Date: | 03.07.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.03.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G01L27/00 | [1997/08] | CPC: |
G01L9/0077 (EP);
A61B5/02154 (EP);
G01L19/02 (EP);
G01L27/005 (EP);
G02B6/14 (EP);
G02B6/3845 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1996/27] | H01J40/14 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1996/27] | Title | German: | FASEROPTISCHER DRUCKWANDLER MIT DRIFTKORREKTURVORRICHTUNG ZUR IN SITU EICHUNG | [1999/26] | English: | FIBEROPTIC PRESSURE SENSOR HAVING DRIFT CORRECTING MEANS FOR IN SITU CALIBRATION | [1996/27] | French: | CAPTEUR DE PRESSION A FIBRE OPTIQUE DOTE DE MOYENS DE CORRECTION DE DERIVE POUR L'ETALONNAGE IN-SITU | [1996/27] |
Former [1996/27] | FASEROPTISCHER DRUCKWANDLER MIT DRIFTKORREKTURVORRICHTUNG ZUR EICHUNG AM MESSORT | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.1996 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.1996 | Search fee paid | 26.02.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 26.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/27] | 20.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/32] | 13.03.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2000/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1997 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   26.09.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4141348 (HITTMAN) [A] 1 * column 7, line 25 - line 36; figures 3,4 *; | [A]US4856317 (PIDORENKO ET AL.) [A] 1 * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 3; figure 1 * * column 4, line 32 - line 36 *; | [A]US4886070 (DEMAREST) [A] 1 * column 8, line 25 - line 34; figures 2,4 *; | [PX]US5247171 (WLODARCZYK ET AL.) [PX] 1-6 * claims 1-9 * | International search | [A]US4991590 ; | [A]US5018529 ; | [A]US5048524 |