EP0716569 - ROOT GROWTH INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.06.1998 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.1998 [1998/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [1996/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEUER, Lutz Scheibler-Strasse 83 D-47800 Krefeld / DE | 02 /
ROTHER, Heinz-Joachim Dahlerdyk 124e D-47803 Krefeld / DE | [1996/25] | Application number, filing date | 94925462.7 | 19.08.1994 | [1996/25] | WO1994EP02768 | Priority number, date | DE19934329419 | 01.09.1993 Original published format: DE 4329419 | [1996/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9506408 | Date: | 09.03.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0716569 | Date: | 19.06.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A01N39/02 | [1996/25] | CPC: |
C08K5/0058 (EP,US);
A01N39/02 (EP,US);
C04B24/005 (EP,US);
Y10S428/907 (EP,US);
Y10S428/911 (EP,US);
Y10T428/4935 (EP,US);
Y10T428/662 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/25] | Title | German: | DURCHWURZELUNGSINHIBITOREN | [1996/25] | English: | ROOT GROWTH INHIBITORS | [1996/25] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE LA CROISSANCE DE RACINES | [1996/25] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.1996 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/25] | 12.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.01.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/31] | 27.02.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YX]US2744818 (DAVIE WILLIAM R) [Y] 1,3 [X] 2; | [YX]GB825875 (BOOTS PURE DRUG CO LTD) [Y] 1,3 [X] 2; | [Y]DE1108833 (BAYER AG) [Y] 1,3; | [AX]DE1196115 (BAYER AG) [A] 1,3 [X] 2; | [YX]EP0032631 (FBC LTD [GB]) [Y] 1,3 [X] 2; | [A]US5116414 (BURTON FREDERICK G [US], et al)[A] 1-3 |