28.12.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] |
17.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
05.12.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] |
03.10.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.11.2003 [2003/47] |
13.06.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.07.2003 [2003/31] |
21.02.2003 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 09.04.2003 [2003/15] |
02.03.2002 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 17.04.2002 [2002/16] |
31.01.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
18.01.2002 |
Change - applicant |
published on 06.03.2002 [2002/10] |
04.10.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
04.10.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.09.2001 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
27.09.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
27.03.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
22.02.2001 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
22.02.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
28.09.2000 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
20.04.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
03.12.1999 |
First examination report |
|
02.12.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
29.09.1999 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
29.09.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
26.08.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
23.07.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
24.01.1997 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 12.03.1997 [1997/11] |
24.01.1997 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 12.03.1997 [1997/11] |
22.01.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.01.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.11.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.11.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
29.02.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|