Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU7548394 | Global Dossier | 16.11.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | RU9400191 | 15.08.1994 | RU94015395 | 27.04.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0761796 | Global Dossier | 17.04.2002 | B1 | EP0761796 | 20.03.1997 | A4 | EP0761796 | 12.03.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | RU9400191 | 15.08.1994 | RU94015395 | 27.04.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69430447D1 | 23.05.2002 | D1 | Priority number | Date | RU9400191 | 15.08.1994 | RU94015395 | 27.04.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI964282 | 24.10.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | RU9400191 | 15.08.1994 | RU94015395 | 27.04.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HU219326 | 28.03.2001 | B | HUT76128 | 30.06.1997 | A | HU9602950D0 | 30.12.1996 | D0 | Priority number | Date | RU9400191 | 15.08.1994 | RU94015395 | 27.04.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL178398B | 28.04.2000 | B1 | PL316996 | 03.03.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | RU9400191 | 15.08.1994 | RU94015395 | 27.04.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | UA47402 | 15.07.2002 | C2 | Priority number | Date | RU9400191 | 15.08.1994 | RU94015396 | 27.04.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9529210 | Global Dossier | 02.11.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | RU94015395 | 27.04.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1125958 | 03.07.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | RU94015395 | 27.04.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2078095 | 27.04.1997 | C1 | Priority number | Date | RU94015396 | 27.04.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2088626 | 27.08.1997 | C1 | Priority number | Date | RU94015395 | 27.04.1994 |