EP0714419 - BIODEGRADABLE COMPOSTABLE PLASTIC AND METHOD OF MAKING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.12.1998 [1998/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PLANET POLYMER TECHNOLOGIES INC. Suite A 9985 Businesspark Avenue San Diego CA 92131-1102 / US | [1996/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PETCAVICH, Robert, J. 4136 Palisades Road San Diego, CA 92116-2043 / US | [1996/23] | Representative(s) | Flosdorff, Jürgen, et al Huss, Flosdorff & Partner GbR Klarweinstrasse 39 82467 Garmisch-Partenkirchen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/23] | Flosdorff, Jürgen, Dr., et al Alleestrasse 33 D-82467 Garmisch-Partenkirchen / DE | Application number, filing date | 94925812.3 | 09.08.1994 | [1996/23] | WO1994US09044 | Priority number, date | US19930104198 | 10.08.1993 Original published format: US 104198 | [1996/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9504778 | Date: | 16.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0714419 | Date: | 05.06.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.02.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.02.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/00, C08K5/04, C08B3/22, C08K5/103, C08L1/12 | [1996/46] | CPC: |
C08B3/22 (EP,KR,US);
C08K5/04 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1996/23] | C08K5/00, C08K5/04, C08B3/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1996/23] | Title | German: | BIOABBAUBARE KOPMPOSTIERBARER KUNSTSTOFF SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DESSELBEN | [1996/23] | English: | BIODEGRADABLE COMPOSTABLE PLASTIC AND METHOD OF MAKING THE SAME | [1996/23] | French: | PLASTIQUE BIODEGRADABLE ET COMPOSTABLE ET SON PROCEDE D'OBTENTION | [1996/23] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.1996 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.1996 | Search fee paid | 06.03.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 06.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/23] | 30.01.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/49] | 08.07.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1998 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US3846521 (OSTERHOLTZ F); | [XY]US3943933 (GERTZMAN ARTHUR A); | [Y]US4180536 (HOWELL CARL J JR [US], et al); | [Y]US4415734 (YABUNE HIDEO [JP], et al); | [XY]US5096940 (MOR EBRAHIM [US]) |