EP0804215 - TEMPLATE ASSEMBLED SYNTHETIC PROTEIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.10.2002 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE SCRIPPS RESEARCH INSTITUTE 10666 North Torrey Pines Road La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | [1997/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAWSON, Philip E. 8560-C Via Mallorca Drive La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | 02 /
KENT, Stephen B.H. 6046 Hermosa Avenue La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | [1997/45] | Representative(s) | Hedley, Nicholas James Matthew Kilburn & Strode LLP Lancon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/45] | Hedley, Nicholas James Matthew Stephenson Harwood One, St. Paul's Churchyard London EC4M 8SH / GB | Application number, filing date | 94925866.9 | 11.08.1994 | [1997/45] | WO1994US09165 | Priority number, date | US19930105369 | 11.08.1993 Original published format: US 105369 | [1997/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9504543 | Date: | 16.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0804215 | Date: | 05.11.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.02.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0804215 | Date: | 28.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.02.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07K1/107, C07K7/02 | [2000/48] | CPC: |
C07K7/02 (EP);
C07K1/1077 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/24] | C07K1/107, C07K7/02, A61K38/00 | ||
Former IPC [1997/45] | A61K38/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/45] | Extension states | LT | 08.02.1996 | SI | 08.02.1996 | Title | German: | ANHAND EINER VORLAGE AUFGEBAUTES SYNTHETISCHES PROTEIN | [1997/45] | English: | TEMPLATE ASSEMBLED SYNTHETIC PROTEIN | [1997/45] | French: | PROTEINE SYNTHETIQUE ASSEMBLEE PAR MATRICE | [1997/45] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.1996 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.1996 | Search fee paid | 08.02.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.02.1996 | Examination requested [1997/45] | 04.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.11.2001 | BE | 28.11.2001 | CH | 28.11.2001 | FR | 28.11.2001 | GR | 28.11.2001 | IT | 28.11.2001 | LI | 28.11.2001 | NL | 28.11.2001 | DK | 28.02.2002 | PT | 28.02.2002 | SE | 28.02.2002 | DE | 01.03.2002 | ES | 30.05.2002 | GB | 11.08.2002 | LU | 11.08.2002 | IE | 12.08.2002 | [2008/05] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 28.11.2001 | |
BE | 28.11.2001 | ||
CH | 28.11.2001 | ||
FR | 28.11.2001 | ||
GR | 28.11.2001 | ||
LI | 28.11.2001 | ||
NL | 28.11.2001 | ||
DK | 28.02.2002 | ||
PT | 28.02.2002 | ||
SE | 28.02.2002 | ||
DE | 01.03.2002 | ||
ES | 30.05.2002 | ||
GB | 11.08.2002 | ||
LU | 11.08.2002 | ||
IE | 12.08.2002 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 28.11.2001 | |
BE | 28.11.2001 | ||
CH | 28.11.2001 | ||
GR | 28.11.2001 | ||
LI | 28.11.2001 | ||
NL | 28.11.2001 | ||
DK | 28.02.2002 | ||
PT | 28.02.2002 | ||
SE | 28.02.2002 | ||
DE | 01.03.2002 | ||
ES | 30.05.2002 | ||
GB | 11.08.2002 | ||
LU | 11.08.2002 | ||
IE | 12.08.2002 | ||
Former [2004/21] | AT | 28.11.2001 | |
BE | 28.11.2001 | ||
CH | 28.11.2001 | ||
GR | 28.11.2001 | ||
LI | 28.11.2001 | ||
NL | 28.11.2001 | ||
DK | 28.02.2002 | ||
PT | 28.02.2002 | ||
SE | 28.02.2002 | ||
DE | 01.03.2002 | ||
ES | 30.05.2002 | ||
GB | 11.08.2002 | ||
IE | 12.08.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 28.11.2001 | |
BE | 28.11.2001 | ||
CH | 28.11.2001 | ||
GR | 28.11.2001 | ||
LI | 28.11.2001 | ||
NL | 28.11.2001 | ||
DK | 28.02.2002 | ||
PT | 28.02.2002 | ||
SE | 28.02.2002 | ||
DE | 01.03.2002 | ||
ES | 30.05.2002 | ||
IE | 12.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 28.11.2001 | |
BE | 28.11.2001 | ||
CH | 28.11.2001 | ||
GR | 28.11.2001 | ||
LI | 28.11.2001 | ||
NL | 28.11.2001 | ||
DK | 28.02.2002 | ||
PT | 28.02.2002 | ||
SE | 28.02.2002 | ||
DE | 01.03.2002 | ||
IE | 12.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/42] | AT | 28.11.2001 | |
BE | 28.11.2001 | ||
CH | 28.11.2001 | ||
GR | 28.11.2001 | ||
LI | 28.11.2001 | ||
NL | 28.11.2001 | ||
PT | 28.02.2002 | ||
SE | 28.02.2002 | ||
DE | 01.03.2002 | ||
IE | 12.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/30] | AT | 28.11.2001 | |
BE | 28.11.2001 | ||
CH | 28.11.2001 | ||
GR | 28.11.2001 | ||
LI | 28.11.2001 | ||
NL | 28.11.2001 | ||
PT | 28.02.2002 | ||
SE | 28.02.2002 | ||
DE | 01.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 28.11.2001 | |
BE | 28.11.2001 | ||
CH | 28.11.2001 | ||
GR | 28.11.2001 | ||
LI | 28.11.2001 | ||
NL | 28.11.2001 | ||
PT | 28.02.2002 | ||
SE | 28.02.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | BE | 28.11.2001 | |
CH | 28.11.2001 | ||
GR | 28.11.2001 | ||
LI | 28.11.2001 | ||
NL | 28.11.2001 | ||
PT | 28.02.2002 | ||
SE | 28.02.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | CH | 28.11.2001 | |
GR | 28.11.2001 | ||
LI | 28.11.2001 | ||
PT | 28.02.2002 | ||
SE | 28.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | GR | 28.11.2001 | |
PT | 28.02.2002 | ||
SE | 28.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/48] | PT | 28.02.2002 | |
SE | 28.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/26] | SE | 28.02.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [PX] - P.DAWSON AND S. KENT, "Convenient total synthesis of a 4-helix TASP molecule by chemoselective ligation", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY., DC US, (19930811), vol. 1993, no. 115, pages 7263 - 7266, XP002062451 [PX] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00069a027 | [Y] - M.MUTTER ET AL., "Template assembled synthetic proteins with four-helix-bundle topology", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY., DC US, (1992), vol. 114, pages 1463 - 1470, XP002062452 [Y] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00030a049 | [YD] - M. SCHNÖLZER AND S. KENT, "Constructing proteins by dovetailing unprotected synthetic peptides", SCIENCE, (1992), vol. 256, pages 221 - 225, XP002062453 [YD] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1566069 | International search | [A]US5066716 (ROBEY FRANK A [US], et al) | [A] - ANGEWANTE CHEMIE INTERNATIONAL EDITION IN ENGLISH, Vol. 28, No. 5, issued May 1989, M. MUTTER et al., "A Chemical Approach to Protein Design- Template-Assembled Synthetic Proteins (TASP)", pages 535-554. |