EP0665948 - MAGNETIC FLOWMETER DETERMINING FLOW RATE FROM PHASE ANGLE DIFFERENCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.1996 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.1996 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.10.1996 [1996/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LEW, Hyok Sang 7890 Oak St. Arvada, CO 80005 / US | [1995/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEW, Hyok, Sang 7890 Oak Street Arvada, CO 80005 / US | 02 /
LEW, Yon, Sung 7890 Oak Street Arvada, CO 80005 / US | 03 /
LEW, Yon, Kyong 7890 Oak Street Arvada, CO 80005 / US | [1995/32] | Representative(s) | Molyneaux, Martyn William, et al Langner Parry 1-2 Bolt Court London EC4A 3DQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/32] | Molyneaux, Martyn William, et al Langner Parry 52-54 High Holborn London WC1V 6RR / GB | ||
Former [1995/32] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94925909.7 | 16.08.1994 | [1995/32] | WO1994US09256 | Priority number, date | US19930110804 | 23.08.1993 Original published format: US 110804 | [1995/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9506854 | Date: | 09.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0665948 | Date: | 09.08.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/58, G01F1/60 | [1995/32] | CPC: |
G01R25/08 (EP,US);
G01F1/588 (EP,US);
G01F1/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1995/32] | Title | German: | MAGNETISCHER FLÜSSIGKEITSMESSER ZUR BESTIMMUNG DES DURCHFLUSSES AUS PHASENWINKELUNTERSCHIEDEN | [1995/32] | English: | MAGNETIC FLOWMETER DETERMINING FLOW RATE FROM PHASE ANGLE DIFFERENCE | [1995/32] | French: | DEBITMETRE MAGNETIQUE DETERMINANT LE DEBIT A PARTIR DE LA DIFFERENCE DES ANGLES DE PHASE | [1995/32] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.1995 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.1995 | Search fee paid | 18.05.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.1995 | Examination requested [1995/44] | 26.08.1996 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1996/43] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4167871 (SHAUGER HERBERT, et al); | [Y]US4503711 (BOHN DAVID C [US]) |