EP0716731 - MAGNETIC FLOWMETER WITH EMPTY PIPE DETECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2001 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROSEMOUNT INC. 12001 Technology Drive Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US | [1996/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROVNER, Bruce, D. 2815 France Avenue South Minneapolis, MN 55416 / US | 02 /
COURSOLLE, Thomas, P. 268 West Robie St. Paul, MN 55107 / US | [1996/25] | Representative(s) | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/25] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 94925967.5 | 18.08.1994 | [1996/25] | WO1994US09421 | Priority number, date | US19930116122 | 02.09.1993 Original published format: US 116122 | [1996/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9506857 | Date: | 09.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0716731 | Date: | 19.06.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0716731 | Date: | 12.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/60, G01F1/00 | [1996/25] | CPC: |
G01F1/60 (EP,US);
G01F1/002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/25] | Title | German: | MAGNETISCH INDUKTIVER DURCHFLUSSMESSER MIT LEERSTANDSDETEKTOR | [1996/25] | English: | MAGNETIC FLOWMETER WITH EMPTY PIPE DETECTOR | [1996/25] | French: | DEBITMETRE MAGNETIQUE DETECTEUR DE TUYAU VIDE | [1996/25] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.1996 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 14.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/25] | 04.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 31.08.2000 | GB | 12.10.2000 | [2008/40] |
Former [2002/12] | GB | 12.10.2000 | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0336615 (AICHI TOKEI DENKI KK [JP]) [DA] 1,3,4,6-8 * column 3, line 33 - column 4, line 14 * * column 5, line 53 - column 6, line 25; figures 2,5 *; | [A]JPS6332321 ; | [A]JPS5847214 ; | [A]EP0521448 (FISCHER & PORTER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,4 * column 4, line 27 - line 52; figure 7 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880708), vol. 12, no. 240, Database accession no. (P - 727), & JP63032321 A 19880212 (FUJI ELECTRIC) [A] 1,4,8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830607), vol. 7, no. 130, Database accession no. (P - 202)<1275> , & JP58047214 A 19830318 (TOKYO SHIBAURA) [A] 1 * abstract * |