EP0669393 - METHOD OF PRODUCING LIQUOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.07.2003 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.09.2003 [2003/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAPPORO BREWERIES LTD. 20-1, Ebisu 4-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-8686 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/35] | For all designated states SAPPORO BREWERIES LTD. 20-1, Ebisu 4-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHINDO, Masashi Sapporo Breweries Limited Brewing Research Laboratories 10, Okatohme Yaizu-shi Shizuoka-ken 425 / JP | [1995/35] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/52] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/35] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER P.O. Box 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94926367.7 | 07.09.1994 | [1995/35] | WO1994JP01476 | Priority number, date | JP19930246128 | 07.09.1993 Original published format: JP 24612893 | JP19930347067 | 27.12.1993 Original published format: JP 34706793 | [1995/35] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9507343 | Date: | 16.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0669393 | Date: | 30.08.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.03.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C12C11/09, C12G1/073, C12G3/02, C12G1/02, C12P7/06, C12M1/40 | [1996/08] | CPC: |
C12C11/07 (EP,US);
C12C11/09 (EP,KR,US);
C12C11/075 (KR);
C12G1/02 (EP,US);
C12G3/02 (EP,KR,US);
C12M25/20 (EP,US);
C12M29/18 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1995/35] | C12C11/09, C12G1/073, C12G3/02 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, FR, GB, NL [1995/35] | Title | German: | METHODE ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ALKOHOLISCHEN GETRÄNKS | [1995/38] | English: | METHOD OF PRODUCING LIQUOR | [1995/35] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE LIQUEUR | [1995/35] |
Former [1995/35] | Herstellungsmethode für alkoholische Getränke | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.1995 | Translation filed | 02.06.1995 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.1995 | Search fee paid | 02.06.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.1995 | Examination requested [1995/43] | 05.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 11.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/36] | 04.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2003/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS58129983 ; | [X]EP0508343 (FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM JUELICH GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-3 * column W *; | [A]GB2168997 (SODASTREAM LTD) [A] 1,4 * claim - *; | [A]US4754698 (NAISH RALPH P [CA]) [A] 1 * column A *; | [A]WO8605202 (VERAX CORP [US]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19831027), vol. 7, no. 242, Database accession no. (C - 192)<1387> , & JP58129983 A 19830803 (HITACHI ZOSEN K.K.) [X] 1,2,4 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPH05317023 (KIKUSUI SHUZO KK, et al); | [A]JPH01277481 (AIR LIQUIDE) |