EP0717670 - THREAD CUTTING INSERT WITH CHIP BREAKERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2001 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.03.2001 [2001/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANDVIK AKTIEBOLAG 811 81 Sandviken / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/12] | For all designated states SANDVIK AKTIEBOLAG 811 81 Sandviken / SE | ||
Former [1996/26] | For all designated states SANDVIK AKTIEBOLAG S-811 81 Sandviken 1 / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ERICKSSON, Hakan Mombygatan 16 S-812 93 Kungsgarden / SE | 02 /
LINDSTRÖM, Olle Idrottsvägen 20 D S-811 32 Sandviken / SE | [1996/26] | Representative(s) | Taquist, Henrik Lennart Emanuel, et al Sandvik AB Patent Department 811 81 Sandviken / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/26] | Taquist, Lennart, et al Sandvik AB Patent Department 811 81 SANDVIKEN / SE | Application number, filing date | 94926450.1 | 07.09.1994 | [1996/26] | WO1994SE00828 | Priority number, date | SE19930002945 | 10.09.1993 Original published format: SE 9302945 | [1996/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9507159 | Date: | 16.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0717670 | Date: | 26.06.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0717670 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 16.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B23B27/16, B23G5/00, // B23B27/22 | [1996/26] | CPC: |
B23B27/065 (EP,US);
B23B27/16 (KR);
B23B27/141 (EP,US);
Y10T407/235 (EP,US);
Y10T407/24 (EP,US);
Y10T407/25 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1996/26] | Title | German: | GEWINDESCHNEIDEINSATZ MIT SPANBRECHERN | [1996/26] | English: | THREAD CUTTING INSERT WITH CHIP BREAKERS | [1996/26] | French: | PLAQUETTE D'OUTIL DE COUPE POUR FILETAGE AVEC BRISE-COPEAUX | [1996/26] | Entry into regional phase | 29.02.1996 | National basic fee paid | 29.02.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.02.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 29.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/26] | 21.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.08.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 29.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/10] | Request for further processing for: | 29.10.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 29.10.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.11.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0119175 (SANTRADE LTD [CH]); | [XA]GB2254026 (POSI THREAD [GB], et al) |