EP0719409 - MULTI-SENSOR SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1999 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.05.1999 [1999/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SECRETARY OF STATE FOR DEFENCE IN HER BRITANNIC MAJESTY'S GOV. OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND RAE Whitehall London SW1A 2HB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/23] | For all designated states SECRETARY OF STATE FOR DEFENCE IN HER BRITANNIC MAJESTY'S GOV. OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND RAE Farnborough, Hampshire GU14 6TD / GB | ||
Former [1996/27] | For all designated states SECRETARY OF STATE FOR DEFENCE IN HER BRITANNIC MAJESTY'S GOV. OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND RAE Farnborough, Hampshire GU14 6TD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOBSON, John, Vincent Hulam Cottage Hulam Farm Castle Eden Hartlepool Cleveland TS27 4SA / GB | [1996/27] | Representative(s) | Bowdery, Anthony Oliver, et al QinetiQ Limited Intellectual Property, Cody Technology Park, Ively Road Farnborough, Hants GU14 0LX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/27] | Bowdery, Anthony Oliver, et al Intellectual Property Department, R69 Building, Defence Evaluation & Research Agency Farnborough, Hampshire GU14 6TD / GB | Application number, filing date | 94926986.4 | 13.09.1994 | [1996/27] | WO1994GB01994 | Priority number, date | GB19930018940 | 14.09.1993 Original published format: GB 9318940 | [1996/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9508112 | Date: | 23.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0719409 | Date: | 03.07.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0719409 | Date: | 03.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/416, G01N35/08 | [1996/27] | CPC: |
G01N35/08 (EP,US);
Y10T436/11 (EP,US);
Y10T436/117497 (EP,US);
Y10T436/25 (EP,US);
Y10T436/25625 (EP,US);
Y10T436/2575 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, NL [1996/27] | Title | German: | MEHRFACHSENSORSYSTEME | [1996/27] | English: | MULTI-SENSOR SYSTEMS | [1996/27] | French: | SYSTEME A DETECTEUR MULTIPLES | [1996/27] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.1996 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/27] | 04.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 17.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 10.12.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4255788 (SCHWARTZ P CHRISTOPHER, et al) [A] 1* column 3, line 32 - column 7, line 60; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US4576706 (TAKATA YOSHINORI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 9, line 12 - column 10, line 41; figures 10,11 *; | [X]EP0529155 (SECR DEFENCE BRIT [GB]) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 10 - line 54; figure 1 * | [X] - WANG, "On-line sensors for trace metals, based on stripping analysis", INTERNATIONAL LABORATORY, FAIRFIELD CT US, (198309), vol. 13, no. 7, pages 12 - 24 [X] 1-3,5 * page 16, column R, paragraph 1; figure 1 * |