Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Legal status: EP0715618

Designated contracting states AT 
 BE 
 CH 
 DE 
 DK 
 ES 
 FR 
 GB 
 GR 
 IE 
 IT 
 LI 
 LU 
 NL 
 PT 
 SE 
Examination procedure03.09.1998Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase11.01.1996National basic fee paid 
11.01.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
11.01.1996Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.07.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
27.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
European patent granted16.12.1998
Opposition procedure17.09.1999No opposition filed within time limit published on 01.12.1999 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:02.04.1999 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:08.12.1999 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
 
Event date:12.06.1996 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE
 
Event date:16.12.1998 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE
 
Event date:12.06.1996 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19960111
 
Event date:16.04.1997 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:19970226
 
Event date:16.12.1998 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:174587
Country of Ref Document:AT
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:19990115
Kind Code of Ref Document:T
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:28.01.1999 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69415326
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:19990128
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:31.12.1998 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:31.12.1998 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH NV
Code Expl.: NEW AGENT
REPRESENTATIVE:DIETLIN & CIE S.A.
 
Event date:10.02.1999 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Event date:01.05.1999 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2127938 ES T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:31.05.1999 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PT SC4A
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE
Free Format Text:AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION
Effective DATE:19990219
 
Event date:23.08.1999 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK T3
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS
 
Event date:01.01.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB IF02
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01
 
Event date:30.08.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Payment DATE:20130627
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.10.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20130813
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.10.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Payment DATE:20130726
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.10.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20130806
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.10.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Payment DATE:20130807
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.10.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20130902
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.10.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Payment DATE:20130902
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.10.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Payment DATE:20130726
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.10.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:20130806
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.10.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Payment DATE:20130726
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:29.11.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20130726
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:29.11.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20130725
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.12.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20130819
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.01.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20130912
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.10.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Payment DATE:20130729
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:25.08.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK EUP
Code Expl.:-EP PATENT EXPIRED
Effective DATE:20140823
 
Event date:26.08.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R071 69415326 DE
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF RIGHT
 
Event date:29.08.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Event date:03.09.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL V4
Code Expl.:-DISCONTINUED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT
Effective DATE:20140823
 
Event date:17.09.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB PE20
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS
Expiry DATE:20140822
 
Event date:30.09.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE EUG
Code Expl.:-EP PATENT HAS LAPSED
 
Event date:15.10.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT MK07 174587 AT T
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY
Effective DATE:20140823
 
Event date:24.09.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE MK9A
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED
 
Event date:02.09.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PT MM4A
Code Expl.:-ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT
Free Format Text:MAXIMUM VALIDITY LIMIT REACHED
Effective DATE:20140823
 
Event date:31.10.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20140826
 
Event date:31.10.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20140823
 
Event date:28.11.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20140822
 
Event date:31.12.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20140902
 
Event date:08.01.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FD2A
Code Expl.:-ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN
Effective DATE:20150108
 
Event date:31.08.2014 
Event description:BE: PATENT EXPIRED
OWNER:G.D. *SEARLE & CO.
Effective DATE:20140823
 
Event date:31.08.2014 
Event description:BE: PATENT EXPIRED
OWNER:THE *MONSANTO CY
Effective DATE:20140823
 
Event date:30.01.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20140824
 
Event date:23.08.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R071 69415326 DE
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF RIGHT
 
Event date:23.10.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GR MA 990400462 GR
Code Expl.:-RIGHT EXPIRED
Effective DATE:20140824
 
Event date:30.10.1998 
Event description:(EXPECTED) GRANT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210
 
Event date:14.09.1998 
Event description:DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IGRA
 
Event date:16.06.1998 
Event description:DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS AGRA
 
Event date:16.06.1998 
Event description:DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IGRA
 
Event date:05.06.1998 
Event description:DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS AGRA
 
Event date:24.03.1998 
Event description:DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS AGRA
 
Event date:26.04.1996 
Event description:PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012
 
Event date:22.10.1999 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT
 
Event date:22.10.1999 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261