EP0717853 - RADAR APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.10.1998 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.12.1998 [1998/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOLLANDSE SIGNAALAPPARATEN B.V. Zuidelijke Havenweg 40 P.O. Box 42 7550 GD Hengelo / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1997/50] | For all designated states HOLLANDSE SIGNAALAPPARATEN B.V. Zuidelijke Havenweg 40 P.O. Box 42 7550 GD Hengelo / NL | ||
Former [1996/26] | For all designated states HOLLANDSE SIGNAALAPPARATEN B.V. Zuidelijke Havenweg 40 P.O. Box 42 NL-7550 GD Hengelo / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GELLEKINK, Bernard Winhofflaan 3 NL-7631 HX Ootmarsum / NL | [1996/26] | Application number, filing date | 94927532.5 | 01.09.1994 | [1996/26] | WO1994EP02905 | Priority number, date | NL19930001552 | 08.09.1993 Original published format: NL 9301552 | [1996/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9507472 | Date: | 16.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0717853 | Date: | 26.06.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0717853 | Date: | 10.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/524, G01S13/24 | [1996/26] | CPC: |
G01S13/5244 (EP,US);
G01S13/52 (KR);
G01S13/24 (EP,US);
G01S13/53 (EP,US);
G01S2013/0254 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1996/26] | Title | German: | RADARGERÄT | [1996/26] | English: | RADAR APPARATUS | [1996/26] | French: | RADAR | [1996/26] | Entry into regional phase | 09.04.1996 | National basic fee paid | 09.04.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.04.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/26] | 30.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.02.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.09.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH03248077 ; | [A]JPH03180792 ; | [Y]EP0044285 (SELENIA IND ELETTRONICHE [IT]) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * * page 3, line 26 - page 5, line 6; figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP0059998 (HOLLANDSE SIGNAALAPPARATEN BV [NL]) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 3, line 9 - page 8, line 6; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0069415 (HOLLANDSE SIGNAALAPPARATEN BV [NL]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US4622555 (DOGGETT JOHN G [US], et al) [A] 1 * column A * * column 2, line 44 - column 9, line 55; figures 1-5 *; | [YD]EP0323662 (HOLLANDSE SIGNAALAPPARATEN BV [NL]) [YD] 1-6 * abstract * * page 2, column 2, line 48 - page 4, column 6, line 5; figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP0547686 (HOLLANDSE SIGNAALAPPARATEN BV [NL]) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 2, column 2, line 27 - page 5, column 7, line 32; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US5225839 (OKUROWSKI FRANK A [US], et al) [A] 1 * column A; figure 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920131), vol. 16, no. 42, Database accession no. (P - 1306), & JP03248077 A 19911106 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911105), vol. 15, no. 433, Database accession no. (P - 1271), & JP03180792 A 19910806 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |