EP0721402 - PNEUMATIC RADIAL TYRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/29] | TYRE WITH RADIAL CASING ARMATURE | ||
[1998/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.1999 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE GENERALE DES ETABLISSEMENTS MICHELIN-MICHELIN & CIE 12, Cours Sablon 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/51] | For all designated states COMPAGNIE GENERALE DES ETABLISSEMENTS MICHELIN - MICHELIN & CIE 12, Cours Sablon 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1996/29] | For all designated states COMPAGNIE GENERALE DES ETABLISSEMENTS MICHELIN - MICHELIN & CIE 12, Cours Sablon F-63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BILLIERES, Jean 7, rue du Parc-de-Montjuzet F-63100 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | [1996/29] | Representative(s) | Devaux, Edmond-Yves Michelin & Cie, Service SGD/LG/PI Ladoux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 01 / FR | [1997/06] |
Former [1996/29] | Devaux, Edmond-Yves Michelin & Cie, Service SK-PI 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 94927575.4 | 07.09.1994 | [1996/29] | WO1994EP02982 | Priority number, date | FR19930011825 | 30.09.1993 Original published format: FR 9311825 | [1996/29] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9509090 | Date: | 06.04.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0721402 | Date: | 17.07.1996 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0721402 | Date: | 16.12.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B60C15/024, B60C15/00 | [1996/29] | CPC: |
B60C15/0027 (EP,US);
B60C15/024 (EP,US);
Y10T152/10819 (EP,US);
Y10T152/10828 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1996/29] | Title | German: | RADIALER LUFTREIFEN | [1996/29] | English: | PNEUMATIC RADIAL TYRE | [1998/51] | French: | PNEUMATIQUE A ARMATURE DE CARCASSE RADIALE | [1996/29] |
Former [1996/29] | TYRE WITH RADIAL CASING ARMATURE | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.1996 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/29] | 07.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 07.09.1999 | [2004/39] | Cited in | International search | [Y]FR2368375 (MICHELIN & CIE [FR]) [Y] 1,3-5 * page 2, lines 11-21; figure -; claim - *; | [Y]EP0358490 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [Y] 1,3-5 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP0077161 (DUNLOP LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP0253568 (SP TYRES UK LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - * |