EP0672421 - ENDOTHELIN ACTIVITY INHIBITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.03.2003 [2003/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kurashiki Boseki Kabushiki Kaisha 7-1, Hommachi Kurashiki-shi Okayama 710 / JP | For all designated states Okada, Hidechika 5-1, Hoshikuma 1-chome, Jonan-ku Fukuoka-shi Fukuoka 814-01 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states Kurashiki Boseki Kabushiki Kaisha 7-1, Hommachi Kurashiki-shi Okayama 710 / JP | ||
For all designated states Okada, Hidechika 5-1, Hoshikuma 1-chome, Jonan-ku Fukuoka-shi Fukuoka 814-01 / JP | |||
Former [1995/38] | For all designated states Kurashiki Boseki Kabushiki Kaisha 7-1, Hommachi Kurashiki-shi Okayama 710 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHSHIMA, Kunihiro 7-1-1425, Minamihorie 4-chome, Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550 / JP | 02 /
KAWAMURA, Seiko 9-19, Nakanoshinmachi Shijonawate-shi, Osaka 575 / JP | 03 /
YAMAMOTO, Ryohei 2-17, Hara 2-chome Chita-shi, Aichi 478 / JP | 04 /
NISHINO, Toyokazu 15-1, Uenocho Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567 / JP | 05 /
OKADA, Hidechika 5-1, Hoshikuma 1-chome, Jonan-ku Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 814-01 / JP | 06 /
BARANYI, Lajos 19-16, Aza Yamanaka, Noyoricho Toyohashi-shi, Aichi 441 / JP | [1995/38] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/38] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem. Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 94927840.2 | 04.10.1994 | [1995/38] | WO1994JP01658 | Priority number, date | JP19930251445 | 07.10.1993 Original published format: JP 25144593 | [1995/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9509643 | Date: | 13.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0672421 | Date: | 20.09.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0672421 | Date: | 20.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.04.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/17, // C07K14/72 | [1995/38] | CPC: |
C07K14/72 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP);
A61K39/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1995/38] | Title | German: | HEMMER DER AKTIVITÄT VON ENDOTHELIN | [1995/38] | English: | ENDOTHELIN ACTIVITY INHIBITOR | [1995/38] | French: | INHIBITEUR DE L'ACTIVITE DE L'ENDOTHELINE | [1995/38] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.1995 | Translation filed | 03.06.1995 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.1995 | Search fee paid | 03.06.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/38] | 18.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]WO8605208 (UNIV TEXAS [US]); | International search | [A]EP0522868 (SHIONOGI & CO [JP]) |