EP0719373 - CORNER JOINT ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2000 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SKANDINAVISKA ALUMINIUM PROFILER AB Metallvägen S-574 81 Vetlanda / SE | [1996/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHANSEN, Lasse Vandringsstigen 21 S-574 39 Vetlanda / SE | [1996/27] | Representative(s) | Harrison, Michael Charles Albihns GmbH, Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/43] | Harrison, Michael Charles Albihns GmbH, Grasserstrasse 10 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/27] | Harrison, Michael Charles ALBIHNS GmbH, Grasserstrasse 10 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94927893.1 | 14.09.1994 | [1996/27] | WO1994SE00852 | Priority number, date | SE19930003014 | 15.09.1993 Original published format: SE 9303014 | [1996/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9508041 | Date: | 23.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0719373 | Date: | 03.07.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0719373 | Date: | 09.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 23.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/964, E06B7/14 | [1996/27] | CPC: |
E06B3/305 (EP);
E06B3/9636 (EP);
E06B7/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, GB, NL, SE [1996/27] | Title | German: | ECKVERBINDUNG | [1996/27] | English: | CORNER JOINT ASSEMBLY | [1996/27] | French: | ENSEMBLE JOINT D'ANGLE | [1996/27] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.1996 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 26.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/27] | 17.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.12.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1998 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   29.10.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 09.06.1999 | NL | 09.06.1999 | SE | 09.06.1999 | DK | 09.09.1999 | DE | 10.09.1999 | GB | 14.09.1999 | [2003/45] |
Former [2003/08] | BE | 09.06.1999 | |
NL | 09.06.1999 | ||
SE | 09.06.1999 | ||
DE | 10.09.1999 | ||
GB | 14.09.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | BE | 09.06.1999 | |
SE | 09.06.1999 | ||
DE | 10.09.1999 | ||
GB | 14.09.1999 | ||
Former [2001/09] | BE | 09.06.1999 | |
DE | 10.09.1999 | ||
GB | 14.09.1999 | ||
Former [2000/23] | BE | 09.06.1999 | |
DE | 10.09.1999 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3310230 ; | [A]US4136496 |