EP0723427 - GAUGE FOR THE MEDULLARY CAVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2000 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): CH, LI | published on 27.12.2000 [2000/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ORTHOFIX S.r.l. Via Delle Nazioni, 9 37012 Bussolengo (VR) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/31] | For all designated states ORTHOFIX S.r.l. 9, Via Delle Nazioni (Z.I.) I-37012 Bussolengo (VR) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FACCIOLI, Giovanni Via Europa, 19 I-46040 Monzambano / IT | 02 /
ROSSI, Stefano Via Sacchi, 7 I-37124 Verona / IT | 03 /
PENNIG, Dietmar Laukamp 11 D-4400 Münster / DE | [1996/31] | Representative(s) | Thomson, Paul Anthony, et al Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/31] | Thomson, Paul Anthony, et al Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside L41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 94928399.8 | 29.09.1994 | [1996/31] | WO1994EP03251 | Priority number, date | IT1993VR00074 | 12.10.1993 Original published format: IT VR930074 | [1996/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9510237 | Date: | 20.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0723427 | Date: | 31.07.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0723427 | Date: | 06.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/56 | [1996/31] | CPC: |
A61B17/72 (EP,KR);
A61B90/39 (EP,KR);
A61B2017/0046 (EP,KR);
A61B2090/034 (EP,KR);
A61B2090/062 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1996/31] | Title | German: | MESSGERÄT FÜR MARKKANAL | [1996/31] | English: | GAUGE FOR THE MEDULLARY CAVITY | [1996/31] | French: | JAUGE DE CAVITE MEDULLAIRE | [1996/31] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.1996 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/31] | 15.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.02.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 06.08.1997 | CH | 06.08.1997 | LI | 06.08.1997 | LU | 30.09.1997 | [2000/52] |
Former [2000/50] | BE | 06.08.1997 | |
LU | 30.09.1997 | ||
CH | 11.11.1997 | ||
LI | 11.11.1997 | ||
Former [2000/07] | BE | 06.08.1997 | |
LU | 30.09.1997 | ||
Former [1998/21] | BE | 06.08.1997 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3763855 (MC ATEE R) [A] 2* column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 2 *; | [Y]US5013318 (SPRANZA III JOSEPH J [US]) [Y] 1-8 * column 3, line 46 - line 54 *; | [A]US5171248 (ELLIS JOHN G [US]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]US5197465 (MONTGOMERY STUART K [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 20 - line 27 *; | [YD]WO9315669 (PENNIG DIETMAR [DE]) [YD] 1-8 * claim 1 * |